Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2122495

EP2122495 - PRESENTATION OF LOCATION RELATED AND CATEGORY RELATED SEARCH RESULTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.07.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2009/48]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WOLOSIN, Gabriel
616 Magnolia Drive
San Mateo, California 94402 / US
02 / YUEH-CHWEN LU, Charity
390 Juanita Way
Los Altos, California 94022 / US
 [2009/48]
Representative(s)Williams, Michael David , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Peterreins, Frank
Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
Application number, filing date08713811.117.01.2008
[2009/48]
WO2008US51354
Priority number, dateUS2007062419117.01.2007         Original published format: US 624191
[2009/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008089356
Date:24.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2122495
Date:25.11.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008
[2009/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2009/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/48]
TitleGerman:DARSTELLUNG VON ORTSBEZOGENEN UND KATEGORIEBEZOGENEN SUCHERGEBNISSEN[2009/48]
English:PRESENTATION OF LOCATION RELATED AND CATEGORY RELATED SEARCH RESULTS[2009/48]
French:PRÉSENTATION DE RÉSULTATS LOCAUX[2009/48]
Entry into regional phase17.08.2009National basic fee paid 
17.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
17.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/48]
18.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
28.10.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination23.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0585/16
25.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1555625  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] , [0018] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0026] , [0027] * * paragraphs [0031] , [0036] *;
 [XA]US2006149734  (EGNOR DANIEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,6 * figure 15 * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0083] * [A] 2,5,7-21;
 [A]WO0041090  (MICRO INTEGRATION CORP [US]; PARSONS JOHN A [US]; FISHER ED [US]; HOTC) [A] 1,10,14,21 * figures 11,12D * * page 51, line 3 - page 53, line 15 *;
 [A]WO2005066844  (GOOGLE INC [US]; TAYLOR BRET C [US]; MAYER MARISSA [US]; BUYUKKOKTEN O) [A] 1,10,12,15,21 * figures 5,6 * * page 7, line 1 - line 11 *;
 [A]WO0241190  (HOLBROOK DAVID M [US]) [A] 1,10,21 * figure 4 *;
 [A]  - LEE WANG ET AL, "Detecting dominant locations from search queries", SIGIR '05: PROCEEDINGS OF THE 28TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL ACM SIGIR CONFERENCE ON RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT IN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, Salvador, Brazil, August 15-19, 2005, (20050819), pages 424 - 431, URL: http://doi.acm.org/10.1145/1076034.1076107, (20080617), XP002484857 [A] 1-21 * figure 1 *