Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2155222

EP2155222 - EXTRACT OF TRIGONELLA FOENUM-GRAECUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
V-Biotek Holding ApS
Vimmelskaftet 43
1161 Copenhagen K / DK
[2017/46]
Former [2010/08]For all designated states
V-Biotek Holding ApS
Vimmelskaftet 43
1161 Copenhagen K / DK
Inventor(s)01 / OLSEN, Jens Steen
Ørsted Bygade 5
DK-4622 Havdrup / DK
 [2010/08]
Representative(s)Nordic Patent Service A/S
Bredgade 30
1260 Copenhagen K / DK
[2017/46]
Former [2010/08]Rasmussen, Torben Ravn , et al
Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S Rigensgade 11
1316 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date08715639.414.04.2008
[2010/08]
WO2008DK50086
Priority number, dateUS20070911653P13.04.2007         Original published format: US 911653 P
[2010/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008125120
Date:23.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2155222
Date:24.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008
[2010/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2155222
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/48, A01N65/20
[2017/20]
Former International [2010/08]A61K36/48
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/46]
Former [2010/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EXTRAKT VON TRIGONELLA FOENUM GRAECUM[2017/20]
English:EXTRACT OF TRIGONELLA FOENUM-GRAECUM[2010/08]
French:EXTRAIT DE TRIGONELLA FOENUM-GRAECUM[2017/20]
Former [2010/08]EXTRAKT AUS TRIGONELLA FOENUM GRAECUM
Former [2010/08]EXTRAIT DE<I>TRIGONELLA FOENUM-GRAECUM</I>
Entry into regional phase12.11.2009National basic fee paid 
12.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/08]
23.12.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2010Observations by third parties
01.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
25.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2017Fee for grant paid
05.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.08.2011
Opposition(s)17.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.05.2012Request for further processing filed
24.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.06.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
18.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
20.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
21.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201306   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.2013
30.04.201508   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
IE14.04.2018
LU14.04.2018
MT14.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/19]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
IE14.04.2018
LU14.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2019/12]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
LU14.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2019/08]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
LU14.04.2018
Former [2018/52]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/42]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
GR16.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]  - PARVIZPUR A ET AL, "Spinal serotonergic system is partially involved in antinociception induced by Trigonella foenum-graecum (TFG) leaf extract", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS LTD, IE, (20041101), vol. 95, no. 1, ISSN 0378-8741, pages 13 - 17, XP004564813 [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10,14-17,20,29,31,1,2,6,7,9,10,14-17,20,29,31,1,2,6,7,9,10,14-17,20,29,31 * abstract * * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.5] * * abstract * * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.5] * * abstract * * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.5] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2004.05.020
 [X]  - O'MAHONY R ET AL, "Bactericidal and anti-adhesive properties of culinary and medicinal plants against Helicobacter pylori", WORLD JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, WJG PRESS, CN, (20050101), vol. 11, no. 47, ISSN 1007-9327, pages 7499 - 7507, XP003023870 [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10,1-4,6,7,9,10,1-4,6,7,9,10 * abstract * * tables 1,2 * * Discussion * * abstract * * tables 1,2 * * Discussion * * abstract * * tables 1,2 * * Discussion *
 [X]  - RANDHIR REENA ET AL, "Phenolics, their antioxidant and antimicrobial activity in dark germinated fenugreek sprouts in response to peptide and phytochemical elicitors.", ASIA PACIFIC JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION 2004, (2004), vol. 13, no. 3, ISSN 0964-7058, pages 295 - 307, XP008104561 [X] 1,2,1,2,1,2 * abstract * * page 295 * * page 298 - page 299 * * page 305, column 1, paragraph 2 * * abstract * * page 295 * * page 298 - page 299 * * page 305, column 1, paragraph 2 * * abstract * * page 295 * * page 298 - page 299 * * page 305, column 1, paragraph 2 *
 [X]  - BHATIA K ET AL, "Aqueous extract of Trigonella foenum-graecum L. ameliorates additive urotoxicity of buthionine sulfoximine and cyclophosphamide in mice", FOOD AND CHEMICAL TOXICOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 44, no. 10, ISSN 0278-6915, (20061001), pages 1744 - 1750, (20061001), XP025065515 [X] 1,2,5-9,14-22,29-31,1,2,5-9,14-22,29-31,1,2,5-9,14-22,29-31 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [2.1.1] * * paragraph [0004] * * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [2.1.1] * * paragraph [0004] * * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [2.1.1] * * paragraph [0004] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fct.2006.05.013
 [X]  - BIN-HAFEEZ BILAL ET AL, "Immunomodulatory effects of fenugreek (Trigonella foenum graecum L.) extract in mice", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030201), vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 1567-5769, pages 257 - 265, XP002482573 [X] 1,2,5-9,14-22,29-31,1,2,5-9,14-22,29-31,1,2,5-9,14-22,29-31 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [0004] * * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [0004] * * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [0004] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1567-5769(02)00292-8
 [X]  - STARK A ET AL, "THE EFFECT OF AN ETHANOL EXTRACT DERIVED FROM FENUGREEK (TRIGONELLA FOENUM-GRAECUM) ON BILE ACID ABSORPTION AND CHOLESTEROL LEVELS IN RATS", BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19930101), vol. 69, no. 1, ISSN 0007-1145, pages 277 - 287, XP000879070 [X] 1,2,5-9,14-22,29-31,1,2,5-9,14-22,29-31,1,2,5-9,14-22,29-31 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1079/BJN19930029
 [X]  - PEMONGE ET AL, "Effects of Materials and Extracts of Trigonella foenum graecum against the Stored Product Pest Tribolium castaneum (Herbst)", JOURNAL OF STORED PRODUCTS RESEARCH, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (19970101), vol. 33, no. 3, ISSN 0022-474X, pages 209 - 217, XP002321880 [X] 1-9,14-22,27-31,34,35,1-9,14-22,27-31,34,35,1-9,14-22,27-31,34,35 * abstract * * page 210, paragraph 2 * * page 215 - page 216 * * figure 2 * * abstract * * page 210, paragraph 2 * * page 215 - page 216 * * figure 2 * * abstract * * page 210, paragraph 2 * * page 215 - page 216 * * figure 2 *
ExaminationUS2005153001
    - Priyanjali Dixit ET AL, "Antioxidant properties of germinated fenugreek seeds", Phytotherapy Research, (20051101), vol. 19, no. 11, doi:10.1002/ptr.1769, ISSN 0951-418X, pages 977 - 983, XP055108949

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ptr.1769
by applicant   - "Bactericidal and anti-adhesive properties of culinary and medicinal plants against Helicobacter pylori", O'MAHONY R ET AL., WORLD JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY, WJG PRESS, (20050101), vol. 11, pages 7499 - 7507
    - "Aqueous extract of Trigonella foenum-graecum L. ameliorates additive urotoxicity of buthionine sulfoximine and cyclophosphamide in mice", BHATIA K ET AL., FOOD AND CHEMICAL TOXICOLOGY, PERGAMON, (20061001), vol. 44, pages 1744 - 1750
    - "THE EFFECT OF AN ETHANOL EXTRACT DERIVED FROM FENUGREEK (TRIGONELLA FOENUM-GRAECUM) ON BILE ACID ABSORPTION AND CHOLESTEROL LEVELS IN RATS", STARK A ET AL., BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (19930301), vol. 69, pages 277 - 287
    - "Effects of Materials and Extracts of Trigonella foenum graecum against the Stored Product Pest Tribolium castaneum (Herbst", PEMONGE ET AL., JOURNAL OF STORED PRODUCTS RESEARCH, PERGAMON PRESS, (19970101), vol. 33, pages 209 - 217
    - "Immunomodulatory effects of fenugreek (Trigonella foenum graecum L.) extract in mice", BIN-HAFEEZ BILAL ET AL., INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, (20030201), vol. 3, pages 257 - 265
other   - ABU ALI IBN SINA, "Hulba", TKDL, XP003026286
    - ABU BAKR MOHD. BIN ZAKARIYA, "Ghargharah Bara-e-Waram-e Halaq Balghami", TKDL, XP003026637
    - ABU BAKR MOHD. BIN ZAKARIYA, "Zimaad-e-faashra", TKDL, XP003026638
    - ABU BAKR MOHD. BIN ZAKARIYA, "Dawa-e-Hulba", TKDL, XP003026639
    - "Vatasulantaka Yoga-03", TKDL, XP003026640
    - KANDASAMY MUDALIAR, "Kariapavala Patru", TKDL, XP003026641
    - AGASTHIYAR, "Thumati Legium", TKDL, XP003026642