Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2122134

EP2122134 - EXHAUST GAS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Database last updated on 23.09.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2016Change: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
01.08.2016Deletion: Receipt of observations in an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tenneco GmbH
An der Bundesstrasse 38
67840 Edenkoben / DE
[2012/17]
Former [2009/48]For all designated states
Heinrich Gillet GmbH
An der Bundesstrasse 38
67480 Edenkoben / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HAVERKAMP, Sascha
Wernher-von-Braun-Strasse 3a
76751 Jockgrim / DE
02 / MATZ, Kim
In den Erlen 1b
67480 Edenkoben / DE
03 / DATZ, Wolfgang
Burgholzweg 50
72070 Tübingen / DE
04 / SCHUSTER, Markus
Hermann-Löns-Str. 31
67435 Neustadt/Mussbach / DE
[2010/01]
Former [2009/48]01 / HAVERKAMP, Sascha
Wernher-von-Braun-Strasse 3a
76751 Jockgrim / DE
02 / MATZ, Kim
Friedrich-Andrae-Strasse 24a
67480 Edenkoben / DE
03 / DATZ, Wolfgang
Burgholzweg 50
72070 Tübingen / DE
04 / SCHUSTER, Markus
Hermann-Löns-Str. 31
67435 Neustadt/Mussbach / DE
Representative(s)Thews, Karl
STT Sozietät Thews & Thews
Patentanwälte
Augustaanlage 32
68165 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/34]Thews, Karl
STT Sozietät Thews & Thews Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 32
68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [2011/34]Patentanwälte Bitterich, Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger
Westring 17
76829 Landau / DE
Former [2009/48]Patentanwälte Möll, Bitterich & Dr. Keller
Westring 17
76829 Landau/Pfalz / DE
Application number, filing date08716627.819.03.2008
[2009/48]
WO2008EP02203
Priority number, dateDE20072004230U22.03.2007         Original published format: DE 202007004230 U
[2009/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008113577
Date:25.09.2008
Language:DE
[2008/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2122134
Date:25.11.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008
[2009/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2122134
Date:15.09.2010
Language:DE
[2010/37]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP25.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/035, F01N3/28, F01N13/18
[2010/10]
Former International [2009/48]F01N3/035, F01N3/28, F01N7/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/48]
TitleGerman:ABGASANLAGE[2009/48]
English:EXHAUST GAS SYSTEM[2009/48]
French:SYSTÈME D'ÉCHAPPEMENT[2009/48]
Entry into regional phase08.09.2009National basic fee paid 
08.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.08.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/48]
12.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2010Fee for grant paid
20.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.04.2011  20.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
J. EBERSPÄCHER GMBH & CO. KG
Eberspächerstrasse 24
D-73730 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater, et al
Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/21]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2011  20.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
J. EBERSPÄCHER GMBH & CO. KG
Eberspächerstrasse 24
D-73730 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
BRP Renaud & Partner, et al
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
22.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.10.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.02.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.03.2012Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2012Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
09.04.2013Date of oral proceedings
25.04.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.04.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition08.07.2013Appeal received No.  T1553/13
04.08.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2016/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
HU15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
MT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
TR15.09.2010
BG15.12.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
LU19.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
AT19.03.2013
GB19.03.2014
FR31.03.2014
DE01.10.2014
[2015/09]
Former [2015/08]CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
HU15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
MT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
TR15.09.2010
BG15.12.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
LU19.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
AT19.03.2013
FR31.03.2014
DE01.10.2014
Former [2014/37]CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
HU15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
MT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
TR15.09.2010
BG15.12.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
LU19.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
AT19.03.2013
Former [2013/45]CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
HU15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
MT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
TR15.09.2010
BG15.12.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
LU19.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
Former [2013/44]CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
MT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
TR15.09.2010
BG15.12.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
LU19.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
Former [2013/42]CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
DK15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
MT15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
BG15.12.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
LU19.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
CH31.03.2012
LI31.03.2012
Former [2011/29]CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
ES26.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
Former [2011/27]CY15.09.2010
CZ15.09.2010
EE15.09.2010
FI15.09.2010
HR15.09.2010
IE15.09.2010
IT15.09.2010
LT15.09.2010
LV15.09.2010
NL15.09.2010
PL15.09.2010
RO15.09.2010
SE15.09.2010
SI15.09.2010
SK15.09.2010
NO15.12.2010
GR16.12.2010
IS15.01.2011
PT17.01.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2817012
 [A]WO02066801
 [A]WO2006029199