blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2115016

EP2115016 - PRODUCTION OF SUPERABSORBENT POLYMERS ON A CONTINUOUS BELT REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Opposition rejectedpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/46]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WEISMANTEL, Matthias
Deutelbacher Str.2
63637 Jossgrund / DE
02 / FUNK, Rüdiger
Heinrich-Heine-Str.15
65527 Niedernhausen / DE
03 / BERTHA, Sylvia
Schulstrasse 15
67227 Frankenthal / DE
04 / BLAIR, Leigh R.
50140 GreenwSpr.Rd.
Greenwood Springs, MS 38848 / US
05 / HEITZHAUS, Kevin D.
4701 Harlequin Way
Chesapeake, VA 23321 / US
06 / STOREY, Bruce
516 Greystone Lane
Chesapeake, VA 23320 / US
 [2009/46]
Representative(s)BASF IP Association
BASF SE
G-FLP-C006
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date08717011.421.02.2008
[2009/46]
WO2008EP52130
Priority number, dateUS20070903078P23.02.2007         Original published format: US 903078 P
[2009/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2008101988
Date:28.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2115016
Date:11.11.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2115016
Date:22.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2008
ClassificationIPC:C08F2/48, C08F2/50, C08F20/00
[2009/46]
CPC:
C08F2/48 (EP,US); B01J19/123 (EP,US); B01J19/22 (EP,US);
C08F2/50 (EP,US); C08F220/06 (EP,US); B01J2219/00033 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0004 (EP,US); B01J2219/0877 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/46]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG SUPERSAUGFÄHIGER POLYMERE AUF EINEM DURCHGEHENDEN BANDREAKTOR[2009/46]
English:PRODUCTION OF SUPERABSORBENT POLYMERS ON A CONTINUOUS BELT REACTOR[2009/46]
French:PRODUCTION DE POLYMÈRES SUPERABSORBANTS SUR UN RÉACTEUR À COURROIE CONTINUE[2009/46]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2009National basic fee paid 
23.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
15.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2013Fee for grant paid
09.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.12.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.02.2014  27.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Operations GmbH
45116 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/14]
Opponent(s)01  21.02.2014  27.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Degussa GmbH
45116 Essen / DE
04.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.12.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
29.05.2019Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/42]
Appeal following opposition11.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0382/16
15.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
29.05.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
29.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
11.06.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.02.2008
AT22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
TR22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
GB21.02.2014
IE21.02.2014
LU21.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
FR28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU21.02.2008
AT22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
GB21.02.2014
IE21.02.2014
LU21.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
FR28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/31]AT22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
GB21.02.2014
IE21.02.2014
LU21.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
FR28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/12]AT22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
GB21.02.2014
IE21.02.2014
LU21.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
FR28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/09]AT22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
GB21.02.2014
IE21.02.2014
LU21.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
FR28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/08]AT22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE21.02.2014
LU21.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
FR28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/07]AT22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE21.02.2014
LU21.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]AT22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
LU21.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
LU21.02.2014
Former [2014/14]AT22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
IT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
NO22.08.2013
ES02.09.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT22.05.2013
NO22.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO02066520  (CIBA SPEC CHEM WATER TREAT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,9-14 * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 3, lines 17-28 * * page 5, lines 7-22 * * page 7, lines 1-22 * * page 6, line 6 * * page 9, line 17 - page 12, line 4 * * page 13, line 14 * * page 14, lines 1-3 * * page 14, lines 8-24 * * page 15, lines 14,15 * * page 16, lines 16,17 * * page 16, lines 23,24 * * page 18, lines 1-26 * * page 19, lines 7-11 * * page 21, lines 4-10 * * page 21, lines 21,22 * * page 22, lines 4-10 * * figure 1 * * example 1 * [Y] 8;
 [DY]EP1683813  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [DY] 8* paragraphs [0001] , [0033] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.