Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2115016 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2115016



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 691
11.09.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
10.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.09.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.08.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 32
30.08.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.08.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.06.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.06.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.06.2019 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
08.04.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
08.04.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 12
15.03.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.03.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.03.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.03.2019 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.03.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.03.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.02.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.02.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
06.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.08.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
30.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
17.07.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.07.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.02.2017 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Appeal 1
15.02.2017 Submission concerning representation Appeal 2
30.08.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.08.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
20.04.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
15.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.04.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
15.04.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 40
08.03.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
03.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Appeal 3
03.03.2016 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 3
23.02.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.02.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.02.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
11.02.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
11.02.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
28.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.12.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
18.12.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
18.12.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
18.12.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
04.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
29.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 47
29.07.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
04.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.02.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.02.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
04.02.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.02.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.08.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
04.04.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.04.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.02.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.02.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
21.02.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
21.02.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
21.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
21.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
21.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
21.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
21.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
21.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
24.05.2013 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
25.04.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
09.04.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.12.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.12.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.12.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.12.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
15.03.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
15.03.2012 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
15.03.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
26.02.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
26.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
26.02.2011 Description Search / examination 1
26.02.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.10.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
26.10.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.10.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.10.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.05.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
27.05.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant Search / examination 1
27.05.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.04.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
16.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
16.04.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.12.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
15.12.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.11.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
02.11.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
14.10.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.10.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
08.09.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
21.07.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.07.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
02.07.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.10.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21
28.08.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.08.2008 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 14
21.02.2008 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 1
21.02.2008 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
21.02.2008 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
21.02.2008 Description PCT receiving Office 11