Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2140406 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2140406



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2630
30.04.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
30.04.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
30.04.2024 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
29.04.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
29.04.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
29.04.2024 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Opposition 1
29.04.2024 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Opposition 1
25.04.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.04.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.04.2024 Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative Opposition 1
23.04.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.04.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.04.2024 Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative Opposition 1
29.02.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
29.02.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
29.02.2024 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
21.02.2024 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 1
26.01.2024 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Opposition 2
23.01.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
23.01.2024 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
23.01.2024 Communication of amended entries Opposition 4
23.01.2024 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
16.01.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.01.2024 General authorisation Opposition 2
16.01.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.01.2024 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
07.11.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.11.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
03.11.2023 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.11.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.11.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.11.2023 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2023 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.10.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.10.2023 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.10.2023 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
19.10.2023 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
19.10.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.10.2023 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2023 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2023 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2023 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 10
19.10.2023 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 10
19.10.2023 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 10
18.07.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
18.07.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
13.07.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.07.2023 Amended description with annotations Opposition 9
13.07.2023 Description Opposition 9
13.07.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
13.07.2023 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.07.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
28.06.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
28.06.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.06.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.06.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.06.2023 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.06.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
12.06.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
05.06.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.06.2023 Amended description with annotations Opposition 9
05.06.2023 Description Opposition 9
05.06.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.06.2023 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
02.06.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
01.06.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.06.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.06.2023 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
04.05.2023 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
04.05.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
04.05.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
04.05.2023 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
04.05.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
04.05.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
04.05.2023 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
18.01.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 58
18.01.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
18.01.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
18.01.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
15.09.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
15.09.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
15.09.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
04.07.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.07.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.07.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
04.07.2022 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 4
20.06.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.06.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.06.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.06.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.06.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.06.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.06.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.06.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.06.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.06.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
03.06.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.06.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.06.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.05.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.05.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.05.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.05.2022 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
19.05.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
19.05.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 3
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 4
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 2
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 4
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 4
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 2
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 4
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 2
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 2
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 4
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 4
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 1
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 Appeal 1
19.05.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 Appeal 4
19.05.2022 Claims Appeal 3
19.05.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.05.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.05.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.05.2022 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Appeal 1
16.05.2022 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
16.05.2022 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
16.05.2022 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
16.05.2022 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
09.05.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.05.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.05.2022 Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative Appeal 2
10.03.2022 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 8
10.03.2022 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 8
10.03.2022 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 8
07.03.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.03.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.03.2022 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
25.02.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.02.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.02.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.02.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
21.02.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
21.02.2022 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
21.02.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.02.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.02.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.02.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.02.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.02.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.02.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.02.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.02.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.02.2022 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 3
07.02.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.02.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.02.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.02.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.02.2022 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
31.01.2022 Refund of fees Appeal 2
25.01.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
25.01.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
25.01.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
20.01.2022 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.01.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.01.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.01.2022 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.01.2022 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
17.12.2021 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
17.12.2021 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
17.12.2021 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
15.12.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.12.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.12.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
09.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.12.2021 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
08.12.2021 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
08.12.2021 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
27.10.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.10.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.10.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 8
21.10.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 8
21.10.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 8
13.10.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.10.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.10.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.10.2021 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
11.03.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.03.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.03.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.03.2021 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
04.03.2021 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
04.03.2021 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
03.03.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.03.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.03.2021 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
26.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.02.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.02.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.02.2021 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
22.02.2021 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
22.02.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.02.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.02.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.02.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.02.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.02.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.02.2021 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
16.02.2021 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
11.02.2021 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 3
11.02.2021 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
22.01.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 13
22.01.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 13
21.01.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 59
21.01.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 59
19.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.01.2021 Authorisation Appeal 1
19.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.01.2021 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
18.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
18.01.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 3
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 4
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 4
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 3
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 4
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 2
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 4
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 2
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 1
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 4
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 4
18.01.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 1
18.01.2021 Claims Appeal 3
18.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.01.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
15.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.01.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
15.01.2021 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.01.2021 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
13.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.01.2021 General enquiry Appeal 1
13.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.12.2020 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 3
16.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
16.12.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.11.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.11.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.11.2020 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
19.11.2020 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
19.11.2020 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
01.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.10.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.10.2020 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.08.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
18.08.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.08.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.08.2020 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
12.08.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
12.08.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.2020 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 6
03.08.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
03.08.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
03.08.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
14.07.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.07.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.07.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.07.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.07.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.07.2020 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.07.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.07.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
03.07.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
03.07.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
03.07.2020 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 25
30.06.2020 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.06.2020 Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC Appeal 1
08.06.2020 Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC Appeal 1
08.06.2020 Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC Appeal 1
02.03.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 3
02.03.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 3
02.03.2020 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
20.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.02.2020 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (proprietor) Appeal 2
14.02.2020 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Appeal 2
12.02.2020 Important information concerning EPO Form 1010 Appeal 1
05.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.02.2020 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 8
05.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.02.2020 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Appeal 1
09.01.2020 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Appeal 2
03.01.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
18.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.12.2019 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Appeal 2
24.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.01.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
16.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.11.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.10.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 16
29.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
29.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 44
29.10.2018 Claims Appeal 30
29.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.10.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.10.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 16
12.06.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.06.2018 Request for a change of address - opponent Appeal 1
07.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.05.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.05.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
12.04.2018 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Appeal 5
09.04.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.04.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
03.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.04.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 22
06.03.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
15.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
15.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
15.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
15.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
15.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
15.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
15.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
15.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
15.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
15.11.2017 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 4
15.11.2017 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 3
15.11.2017 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 3
15.11.2017 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 3
15.11.2017 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 3
15.11.2017 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 3
15.11.2017 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 3
15.11.2017 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 2
15.11.2017 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 2
15.11.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 17
15.11.2017 Claims Appeal 4
15.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.11.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
15.11.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 81
15.09.2017 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Appeal 1
17.08.2017 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 3
09.08.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.08.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
09.08.2017 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Appeal 2
24.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2017 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
17.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
15.05.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
10.05.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
10.05.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
03.03.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
27.02.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.02.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.02.2017 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
27.02.2017 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
27.02.2017 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
27.02.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 30
23.02.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.02.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
23.02.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
16.02.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
03.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
25.01.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
24.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.01.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
16.01.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.01.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 12
16.01.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
16.01.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.01.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.01.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.01.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
16.01.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
16.01.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
16.01.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.01.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.01.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.01.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.01.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.01.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 5
01.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.11.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
16.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 13
11.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.05.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.04.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 19
21.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 19
19.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.04.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
15.04.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.04.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
13.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
19.02.2016 Claims Opposition 4
19.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
17.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
17.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
17.02.2016 Claims Opposition 4
17.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
17.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
21.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
07.10.2015 Claims Opposition 3
07.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 20
17.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
10.08.2015 Claims Opposition 4
10.08.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
07.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
07.08.2015 Claims Opposition 4
07.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.08.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
30.03.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.03.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.03.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.02.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
16.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
16.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
16.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
12.12.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.12.2014 Refund of fees Opposition 1
03.12.2014 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Opposition 4
24.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
24.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
21.11.2014 Claims Opposition 5
21.11.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 34
21.11.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 57
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
21.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Correction to published European patent application/patent specification Search / examination 1
22.05.2014 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
22.05.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
14.05.2014 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.05.2014 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 2
09.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.05.2014 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 2
09.05.2014 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
09.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.05.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 4
09.05.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.02.2014 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
28.02.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
25.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.02.2014 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
25.02.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.02.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
25.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.11.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
14.11.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
14.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.11.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.10.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.10.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
25.10.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.10.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.10.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.09.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.09.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.09.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.08.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.08.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.08.2013 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 10
19.08.2013 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 8
16.08.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.08.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
13.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
13.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
13.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
13.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
13.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
13.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
13.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
13.08.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
12.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
12.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
12.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
12.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
12.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
12.08.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.08.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.08.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 9
02.08.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
17.06.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.06.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
31.05.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
31.05.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 13
31.05.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.05.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.04.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
26.04.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
26.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
26.04.2013 Description Search / examination 4
26.04.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.04.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
11.04.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
11.04.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
11.04.2013 Description Search / examination 4
11.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.04.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
17.12.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
17.12.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.01.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
07.01.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
03.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
03.01.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
03.01.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.12.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
29.12.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
29.12.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
01.12.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.03.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
25.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
23.03.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
23.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
26.01.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
09.12.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.12.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20
03.11.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
07.10.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
02.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.09.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
29.07.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.12.2008 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.09.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
25.09.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
25.09.2008 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 18
04.03.2008 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 1
04.03.2008 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
04.03.2008 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
04.03.2008 Description PCT receiving Office 12
04.03.2008 Drawings PCT receiving Office 2