Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2160495

EP2160495 - PRESS FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.11.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
St. Pöltener Straße 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2019/49]
Former [2010/10]For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / EWALDS, Fredrik
Sjöviksvägen 4
10620 Ekenäs / FI
02 / RAGVALD, Hans
Passgatan 4
643 33 Vingäker / SE
03 / KARLSSON, Jörgen
Svarbichsvige 106
640 19 Katrineholm / SE
04 / GRÖNDAL, Lars-Olof
Blabärsvägen 6
640 10 Högsjö / SE
 [2015/49]
Former [2010/16]01 / EWALDS, Fredrik
Sjöviksvägen 4
FI - 10620 Ekenäs / FI
02 / RAGVALD, Hans
Passgatan 4
S-643 33 Vingäker / SE
03 / KARLSSON, Jörgen
Svarbichsvige 106
S-640 19 Katrineholm / SE
04 / GRÖNDAL, Lars-Olof
Blabärsvägen 6
S-640 10 Högsjö / SE
Former [2010/10]01 / EWALDS, Fredrik
Högsjö Gard
S-640 10 Högsjö / SE
02 / RAGVALD, Hans
Passgatan 4
S-643 33 Vingäker / SE
03 / KARLSSON, Jörgen
Svarbichsvige 106
S-640 19 Katrineholm / SE
04 / GRÖNDAL, Lars-Olof
Blabärsvägen 6
S-640 10 Högsjö / SE
Application number, filing date08717662.412.03.2008
[2010/10]
WO2008EP52916
Priority number, dateDE2007102836515.06.2007         Original published format: DE102007028365
[2010/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008151856
Date:18.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2160495
Date:10.03.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008
[2010/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2160495
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:D21F7/08
[2010/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/49]
Former [2010/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:PRESSFILZ[2015/29]
English:PRESS FABRIC[2010/10]
French:FEUTRE DE PRESSE[2015/29]
Former [2010/10]PRESSGEWEBE
Former [2010/10]ETOFFE POUR IMPRESSION
Entry into regional phase15.01.2010National basic fee paid 
15.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/10]
15.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2015Fee for grant paid
13.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.04.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.08.2016  02.09.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Heimbach GmbH & Co. KG
An Gut Nazareth 73
52353 Düren / DE
Opponent's representative
Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Stresemannallee 4b
41460 Neuss / DE
 [2018/39]
Former [2016/40]
Opponent(s)01  30.08.2016   
Heimbach GmbH & Co. KG
An Gut Nazareth 73
52353 Düren / DE
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Ralf
Paul & Albrecht
Patentanwaltssozietät
Hellersbergstrasse 18
41460 Neuss / DE
07.10.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.02.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.10.2018Date of oral proceedings
06.11.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.11.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition21.12.2018Appeal received No.  T0006/19
26.02.2019Statement of grounds filed
20.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201205   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.2012
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.03.2008
AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
BG02.12.2015
CY02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
TR02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
GB12.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/31]HU12.03.2008
AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CY02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
TR02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
GB12.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2018/28]HU12.03.2008
AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CY02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
MT02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
GB12.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2017/47]AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
MT02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
GB12.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2017/10]AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
GB12.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2017/08]AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
GB12.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2017/07]AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2017/03]AT02.12.2015
BE02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/49]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
MC02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SI02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/47]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/46]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
DK02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
IS02.04.2016
PT04.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
EE02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IS02.12.2015
IT02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
RO02.12.2015
SK02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT02.12.2015
CZ02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IS02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/31]AT02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
IS02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/26]AT02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
NL02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
LV02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT02.12.2015
ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
PL02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
GR03.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES02.12.2015
HR02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
NO02.03.2016
Former [2016/20]ES02.12.2015
LT02.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2005133185  (DESPAULT MARC P [CA] ET AL) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP1632602  (VOITH FABRICS PATENT GMBH [DE] VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0017] - [0023] * * figure - *
OppositionUS2005133185
 EP1632602
 WO0233170
 US3392079
 EP1722034
 EP1767694
 EP1712675
 WO9516810
 WO2004046462
    - SABIT ADANUR, Paper Machine Clothing, (19970000), ISBN 1-56676-544-7