Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025139

EP2025139 - MULTI-MEDIA MESSAGING SYSTEM FOR MOBILE TELEPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2011
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Communigate Limited
29 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / HAYTON, Paul, Michael
Hawtins Cottage 32 North Street
Fritwell Oxfordshire OX27 7QR / GB
02 / JONES, Philip, Stephen
Elm Farm, St James Lane St James South Elmham
Halesworth Suffolk IP19 0HR / GB
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Nicholls, Michael John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Nicholls, Michael John
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date08718615.106.03.2008
[2009/08]
WO2008GB00754
Priority number, dateGB2007000440207.03.2007         Original published format: GB 0704402
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008107675
Date:12.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025139
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025139
Date:12.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/725
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MULTIMEDIA-NACHRICHTENANORDNUNG FÜR MOBILE TELEFONE[2009/08]
English:MULTI-MEDIA MESSAGING SYSTEM FOR MOBILE TELEPHONE[2009/08]
French:SYSTÈME DE MESSAGERIE MULTIMÉDIA DESTINÉ A UN TÉLÉPHONE MOBILE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2008National basic fee paid 
10.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
02.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2010Fee for grant paid
25.01.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.05.2010
BE12.05.2010
CZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
HU12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
MT12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
PT12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
TR12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
BG12.08.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT12.05.2010
BE12.05.2010
CZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
MT12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
PT12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
TR12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
BG12.08.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
Former [2013/42]AT12.05.2010
BE12.05.2010
CZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
MT12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
PT12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
BG12.08.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
Former [2013/32]AT12.05.2010
BE12.05.2010
CZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
MT12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
PT12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
Former [2012/05]AT12.05.2010
BE12.05.2010
CZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
MT12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
Former [2011/25]AT12.05.2010
BE12.05.2010
CZ12.05.2010
DK12.05.2010
EE12.05.2010
FI12.05.2010
HR12.05.2010
IT12.05.2010
LT12.05.2010
LV12.05.2010
NL12.05.2010
PL12.05.2010
RO12.05.2010
SI12.05.2010
SK12.05.2010
CY09.06.2010
NO12.08.2010
GR13.08.2010
ES23.08.2010
IS12.09.2010
Former [2010/45]NL12.05.2010
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2006195506  (DENG LI [US]) [X] 1,2,13-18,21-24 * paragraphs [0024] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0062]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 10,11 [I] 5,8,12,19;
 [Y]US2003125055  (KIM YOUNG HOON [KR], et al) [Y] 10,11 * paragraphs [0026] - [0033] *;
 [A]GB2348082  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 6,7 * pages 6-9 *