Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2146917

EP2146917 - METHOD FOR SELECTIVE FOLDING OR REDIRECTING OF CUT WEB PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/04]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVE FOLDING OR REDIRECTING
[2014/01]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2014/17]
Former [2010/04]For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati OH 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WIEDMANN, Peter
1238 Baywood Cove
Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US
 [2010/04]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/07]Mather, Peter Geoffrey , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2010/13]Heide, Ute , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2010/04]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date08719714.114.03.2008
[2010/04]
WO2008IB50978
Priority number, dateUS2007072469916.03.2007         Original published format: US 724699
[2010/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008114191
Date:25.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2146917
Date:27.01.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008
[2010/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2146917
Date:23.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:B65H29/60, B65H29/62, A61F13/15
[2010/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SELEKTIVEN FALTEN ODER UMLEITEN VON VON EINER BAHN GESCHITTENEN PRODUKTE.[2014/01]
English:METHOD FOR SELECTIVE FOLDING OR REDIRECTING OF CUT WEB PRODUCTS[2014/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PLIAGE OU DE REDIRECTION SÉLECTIVE DES PRODUITS DÉCOUPÉES D'UNE BANDE.[2014/01]
Former [2010/04]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM GEZIELTEN FALTEN UND UMLENKEN
Former [2010/04]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVE FOLDING OR REDIRECTING
Former [2010/04]PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PLIAGE OU DE REDIRECTION SÉLECTIVE
Entry into regional phase01.09.2009National basic fee paid 
01.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2009Examination requested  [2010/04]
06.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2014Fee for grant paid
11.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.09.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.01.2015  02.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Dehns, et al
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/29]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2015  02.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Dehns, et al
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2015/10]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2015   
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
27.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
18.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.05.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
08.08.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/01]
06.11.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition22.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1785/16
21.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
08.08.2019Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.03.2008
AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
MT23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
TR23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
IE14.03.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
GB14.03.2019
[2020/11]
Former [2017/39]HU14.03.2008
AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
MT23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
TR23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
IE14.03.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/03]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
MT23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
IE14.03.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
IE14.03.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
IE14.03.2015
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
LU14.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
LU14.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
MC23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/36]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SI23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/18]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
IT23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/11]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
RO23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/10]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
CZ23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
EE23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
SK23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/08]AT23.04.2014
BE23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
DK23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2015/02]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
PT25.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT23.04.2014
CY23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY23.04.2014
ES23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
HR23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
LV23.04.2014
NL23.04.2014
PL23.04.2014
SE23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
GR24.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY23.04.2014
FI23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
NO23.07.2014
IS23.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY23.04.2014
LT23.04.2014
BG23.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY23.04.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]US4650173  (JOHNSON GARY E [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4519596  (JOHNSON GARY E [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003062121  (FRANKLIN KENT ALLAN [US] ET AL) [A] 7,8 * paragraph [0073]; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]GB1253503  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 87 - page 4, line 41; figures 3,4 *