Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2124983

EP2124983 - A HERBAL PREPARATION EFFECTIVE IN THE PREVENTION AND MANAGEMENT OF RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS AND ASSOCIATED COMPLAINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.10.2011
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.11.2011  [2011/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swaminathan, S.
Dean, Sponsored Research and Director, Centre for Nanotechnology and Advanced, Biomaterials (CeNTAB), SASTRA University
Thanjavur 613 402 / IN
[2009/49]
Inventor(s)01 / DUBEY, Gobind Prasad
National Collaborative Programme Emeritus Professor-Sastra B 29/10 Nandigram
Lanka, Varanasi - 221005 / IN
02 / AGARWAL, Aruna
Department of Basic Principles Insitute of Medical Sciences Banaras Hindu University
Varanasi - 221005 / IN
03 / SUBASINI, U.
Centre for Advanced Research in Indian system of Medicine (CARISM) Sastra University
Thanjavur 613 402 / IN
04 / WILSON, Eugene
Centre for Advanced Research in Indian System of Medicine (CARISM) Sastra University
Thanjavur 613 402 / IN
05 / RAJAMANICKAN, Victor, G.
Centre for Advanced Research in Indian System of Medicine (CARISM) Sastra University
Thanjavur 613 402 / IN
 [2010/01]
Former [2009/49]01 / DUBEY, Gobind Prasad
National Collaborative Programme Emeritus Professor-Sastra B 29/10 Nandigram
Lanka, Varanasi - 221005 / IN
02 / AGARWAL, Aruna
Department of Basic Principles Insitute of Medical Sciences Banaras Hindu University
Varanasi - 221005 / IN
03 / SUBBSINI, U.
Centre for Advanced Research in Indian system of Medicine (CARISM) Sastra University
Thanjavur 613 402 / IN
04 / WILSON, Eugene
Centre for Advanced Research in Indian System of Medicine (CARISM) Sastra University
Thanjavur 613 402 / IN
05 / RAJAMANICKAN, Victor, G.
Centre for Advanced Research in Indian System of Medicine (CARISM) Sastra University
Thanjavur 613 402 / IN
Representative(s)Rapp, Bertram , et al
Charrier Rapp & Liebau
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Fuggerstrasse 20
86150 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Rapp, Bertram , et al
Charrier Rapp & Liebau - Patentanwälte Anwaltshaus Volkhartstrasse 7
86152 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date08720098.618.01.2008
[2009/49]
WO2008IN00035
Priority number, dateIN2007CHE019331.01.2007         Original published format: IN CH01932007
[2009/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008093355
Date:07.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2124983
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008
[2009/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT23.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/53, A61K36/28, A61K36/48, A61K36/51, A61K36/77, A61P29/00
[2010/44]
Former International [2009/49]A61K36/53, A61K36/28, A61K36/48, A61K36/51, A61K36/77
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/49]
TitleGerman:KRÄUTERZUBEREITUNG ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND VERWALTUNG VON RHEUMATOIDER ARTHRITIS UND ZUGEHÖRIGE BESCHWERDEN[2009/49]
English:A HERBAL PREPARATION EFFECTIVE IN THE PREVENTION AND MANAGEMENT OF RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS AND ASSOCIATED COMPLAINTS[2009/49]
French:PRÉPARATION À BASE D'HERBES AROMATIQUES EFFICACE DANS LA PRÉVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DE LA POLYARTHRITE RHUMATOÏDE ET DES SYMPTÔMES ASSOCIÉS[2009/49]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2009National basic fee paid 
31.08.2009Search fee paid 
31.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/49]
07.05.2010Observations by third parties
06.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/48]
08.07.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2011/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]IN190439  ;
 [X]US2006141061  (PALPU PUCHPANGADAN [IN] ET AL PALPU PUCHPANGADAN [IN] ET AL) [X] 1-6 *cf. abstract, page 1, sections [0006] to [0008], page 2, sections [0014] and [0015], page 4, sections [0044] and [0045]*;
 [A]WO02085394  (KHAMAR BAKULESH MAFATLAL [IN]; MODY VANDANA DASHARATHBHAI [IN]; PANDYA) [A] 1-6 *cf. abstract, page 1, paras. 1,2 and 5, together with paras. 1,5 and 6 on page 6*
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 78, Database accession no. 2009-R39960, XP002602696 & IN190439 B 20030726 (BOTHRA D) [X] 1-6 * abstract *
International search[X]WO2006061675  ;
 [A]EP0987027  ;
 [A]  - KUMARAN A. ET AL., "Antioxidant activities of the methanol extract of Cardiospermum halicacabum", EMBASE, Database accession no. (EMB-2006134139), XP008109466
    [ ] - PHARMACEUTICAL BIOLOGY, (200603), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 146 - 151
 [A]  - SINGH R.H. ET AL., "Inhibition of formaldehyde induced arthritis by certain indigenous drugs", EMBASE, Database accession no. (EMB-008167063), XP008109467
    [ ] - INDIAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL RESEARCH, (1966), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 188 - 195
 [A]  - SINGH R.H. ET AL., "Further studies on the antiarthritic effect of an indigenous drug Dalbergia lanceolaria", EMBASE, Database accession no. (EMB-0008167703), XP008109465
    [ ] - INDIAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL RESEARCH, (1966), vol. 54, no. 4, pages 363 - 367
other   - "Vaatha Soolai Kudineer", TKDL, Database accession no. AM05/1773, XP003029429
    - KANDASAMY MUDALIAR, Athmarakshaamirtham, (1879), page 457
    - "Matbookh- Beekh-e- Qarsaana", TKDL, Database accession no. MH2/15F, XP003029430
    - ZIYA AL-DIN ABDULLAH AL-BAITAR, Al Jaam'e-li-Mufradaat-al-Advia-wal-Aghzia, (1874), vol. IV, page 13
    - "Dawa-e-Panjangusht / Panjkisht", TKDL, Database accession no. WA1/212A, XP003029431
    - ZIYA AL-ABDULLAH LBN AL-BAITAR, Al Jaam'e-li-Mufradaat-al-Advia-wal-Aghzia, (1874), vol. I, page 116
    - "Asvagamdhadicurnam", TKDL, Database accession no. AB/85, XP003029432
    - BHARATA BHAISAJYA RATNAKARA, Naginadasa Chaganalala Saha, (1999), vol. I, page 26
    - "Asvagandhadi Curna", TKDL, Database accession no. AK11/4155, XP003029433
    - VANGASENA, Vangasena Commentator Shaligram Vaisya, (1996), page 945
    - "Rasonadikvathah", TKDL, Database accession no. AK/1829, XP003029434
    - GOVINDA DASA, Bhaisajya Ratnavali, (2001), page 435