Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2118897

EP2118897 - MULTILAYER OPTICAL INFORMATION MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/47]MULTILAYER OPTICAL INFORMATION MEDIUM AND OPTICAL INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS THEREFOR, PROGRAM PRODUCT AND INFORMATION MEDIUM INCLUDING THE SAME
[2017/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[2017/30]
Former [2009/47]For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUJII, Toshishige
25-5-611, Okamura 3-chome
Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0021 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Masaetsu
1-2-703, Chigasakihigashi 1-chome
Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-0033 / JP
 [2017/30]
Former [2009/47]01 / FUJII, Toshishige
25-5-611 Okamura 3-chome Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235-0021 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Masaetsu
1-2-703 Chigasakihigashi 1-chome Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-0033 / JP
Representative(s)White, Duncan Rohan , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House (2nd Floor)
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[2017/30]
Former [2011/19]White, Duncan Rohan
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2009/47]Lamb, Martin John Carstairs
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date08721851.705.03.2008
[2009/47]
WO2008JP54435
Priority number, dateJP2007005721207.03.2007         Original published format: JP 2007057212
JP2007027374122.10.2007         Original published format: JP 2007273741
[2009/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008111592
Date:18.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2118897
Date:18.11.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008
[2009/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2118897
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.09.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/007, G11B20/12
[2009/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2017/30]
Former [2010/29]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL 
Former [2009/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MEHRSCHICHTIGES OPTISCHES INFORMATIONSMEDIUM[2017/12]
English:MULTILAYER OPTICAL INFORMATION MEDIUM[2017/12]
French:SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS OPTIQUES MULTICOUCHE[2017/12]
Former [2009/47]MEHRSCHICHTIGES OPTISCHES INFORMATIONSMEDIUM, VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG OPTISCHER INFORMATIONEN DAFÜR SOWIE PROGRAMMPRODUKT UND INFORMATIONSMEDIUM DAMIT
Former [2009/47]MULTILAYER OPTICAL INFORMATION MEDIUM AND OPTICAL INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS THEREFOR, PROGRAM PRODUCT AND INFORMATION MEDIUM INCLUDING THE SAME
Former [2009/47]SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS OPTIQUES MULTICOUCHE, APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS OPTIQUES, PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS COMPRENANT LEDIT PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME
Entry into regional phase29.10.2008National basic fee paid 
29.10.2008Search fee paid 
29.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/47]
08.10.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.03.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
24.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2017Fee for grant paid
13.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.10.2011
Opposition(s)30.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
[2019/35]
Former [2018/28]IT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
Former [2018/08]NL26.07.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2004086403  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-3 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 26; figure 5 *;
 [A]WO2006067666  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO03100702  (SONY CORP [JP], et al);
 [Y]EP1607949  (RICOH KK [JP]);
 [Y]WO9715050  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP])
by applicantJP2000293947
 JP2004295950
 JP2000293889
 JP2007057212
 JP2007273741