Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2134184

EP2134184 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING A CARCASS PART OF SLAUGHTERED POULTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
20.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marel Stork Poultry Processing B.V.
Handelstraat 3
5831 AV Boxmeer / NL
[2010/33]
Former [2009/52]For all designated states
STORK PMT B.V.
Handelstraat 3
5831 AV Boxmeer / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DEN NIEUWELAAR, Adrianus, Josephes
33, Den Hoek
NL-5421 XG Gemert / NL
02 / JANSSEN, Petrus, Christianus, Hendrikus
5, Verbindingsweg
NL-5455 GP Wilbertoord / NL
03 / VAN KIPPERSLUIS, Johannes, Antoon, Vincent
23, Veldhuizerweg
NL-6712 DD Ede / NL
 [2009/52]
Representative(s)EP&C
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[2014/44]
Former [2013/24]Blokhuis, Sophia Elisabeth Dionysia
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Former [2009/52]Blokhuis, Sophia Elisabeth Dionysia
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date08723862.226.03.2008
[2009/52]
WO2008NL00090
Priority number, dateNL2007103360427.03.2007         Original published format: NL 1033604
[2009/52]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008118008
Date:02.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2134184
Date:23.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2008
[2009/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2134184
Date:12.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:A22C21/00
[2009/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/52]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND METHODE ZUM VERARBEITEN EINES SCHLACHTKÖRPERTEILS VON GESCHLACHTETEM GEFLÜGEL[2009/52]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING A CARCASS PART OF SLAUGHTERED POULTRY[2009/52]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE PARTIE DE CARCASSE DE VOLAILLE ABATTUE[2009/52]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2008Translation filed 
26.10.2009National basic fee paid 
26.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/52]
22.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
14.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2013Fee for grant paid
26.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12164268.0  / EP2572586
EP12164271.4  / EP2594135
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.04.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.03.2014  14.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Meyn Food Processing Technology B.V.
Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
Opponent's representative
Van Breda, Jacobus
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V.
Weteringschans 96
1017 XS Amsterdam / NL
 02  12.03.2014  20.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nordischer Maschinenbau Rud. Baader GmbH + Co. KG
Geniner Strasse 249
23560 Lübeck / DE
Opponent's representative
Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte PartmbB
Meiendorfer Strasse 89
22145 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/17]
Opponent(s)01  05.03.2014  14.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Meyn Food Processing Technology B.V.
Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
Opponent's representative
Van Breda, Jacobus
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96
1017 XS Amsterdam / NL
 02  12.03.2014  20.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nordischer Maschinenbau Rud. Baader GmbH + Co. KG
Geniner Strasse 249
23560 Lübeck / DE
Opponent's representative
Stork Bamberger
Patentanwälte
Postfach 73 04 66
22124 Hamburg / DE
Former [2014/16]
Opponent(s)01  05.03.2014   
Meyn Food Processing Technology B.V.
Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
Opponent's representative
Van Breda, Jacobus
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96
1017 XS Amsterdam / NL
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  05.03.2014   
Meyn Food Processing Technology B.V.
Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
06.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.11.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
19.05.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition19.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1638/17
29.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1638/17
19.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
11.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201003   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2011
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.03.2008
AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
TR12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE26.03.2014
LU26.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU26.03.2008
AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE26.03.2014
LU26.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/31]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CY12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE26.03.2014
LU26.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/27]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MC12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE26.03.2014
LU26.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/12]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
MT12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE26.03.2014
LU26.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE26.03.2014
LU26.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
IE26.03.2014
LU26.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
LU26.03.2014
Former [2014/14]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/11]IT26.03.2013
AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
PL12.06.2013
RO12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
CZ12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
SK12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
IS12.10.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT12.06.2013
BE12.06.2013
EE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/08]BE12.06.2013
FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
PT14.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
LV12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI12.06.2013
HR12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
BG12.09.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI12.06.2013
LT12.06.2013
SE12.06.2013
SI12.06.2013
NO12.09.2013
GR13.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT12.06.2013
NO12.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[XA]US6283847  (BERRY ALLAN TODD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,14,15,22,23 * column 9, line 51 - column 11, line 9 * [A] 11-13,16,17;
 [XA]US4648155  (BURNETT T J [US]) [X] 1,3-6,11,14,22,23 * column 1, lines 33-68 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 18; figures 7,8 * [A] 2,12,13,15-17;
 [XA]US4873746  (SCHEIER DONALD J [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,14,22,23 * column 11, line 53 - column 12, line 44; figures 20-26 * [A] 2,12,13,15-17;
 [A]US3266542  (PAOLI STEPHEN A) [A] 18,19 * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 29; figures 1-16 *;
 [A]EP0421551  (STORK PMT [NL]) [A] 7-10,20,21 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 30; figures 1,2,4-6 *
by applicantNL1030671C
 NL1014845C
 EP1430780
 WO2008NL00632