Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2121110

EP2121110 - BIOCOMPATIBLE WOUND DRESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.05.2015
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, HU
published on 04.10.2017  [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
Legal Department - Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/26]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
Legal Department - Intellectual Property P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
Former [2009/48]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
Legal Department - Intellectual Property P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AMBROSIO, Archel
6318 Stable Farm
San Antonio, TX 78249 / US
02 / JOHNSON, Royce, W.
114 Rimdale
Universal City, TX 78148 / US
 [2009/48]
Representative(s)Cordina, Kevin John , et al
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/42]Cordina, Kevin John , et al
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Former [2012/13]Ashton, Timothy , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2010/38]Ashton, Timothy , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2009/48]Maggs, Michael Norman , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date08724562.717.01.2008
[2009/48]
WO2008US00596
Priority number, dateUS2007065788725.01.2007         Original published format: US 657887
[2009/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008091521
Date:31.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2121110
Date:25.11.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008
[2009/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2121110
Date:25.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61M35/00, A61L15/64, A61M27/00
[2012/32]
Former International [2009/48]A61M35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/48]
TitleGerman:BIOKOMPATIBLE WUNDAUFLAGE[2009/48]
English:BIOCOMPATIBLE WOUND DRESSING[2009/48]
French:PANSEMENT BIOCOMPATIBLE[2009/48]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2009National basic fee paid 
11.06.2009Search fee paid 
11.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/48]
07.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2014Fee for grant paid
19.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14168159.3  / EP2767305
EP16189541.2  / EP3127577
EP18160016.4  / EP3372207
EP19178885.0
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.02.2013
Opposition(s)26.03.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.01.2008
AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
IE17.01.2015
LU17.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
MT25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
IE17.01.2015
LU17.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2016/07]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
IE17.01.2015
LU17.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/50]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
LU17.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/47]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
LU17.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/43]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
LU17.01.2015
Former [2015/39]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
LU17.01.2015
Former [2015/30]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/22]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/12]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
HR25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
NO25.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY25.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2005123170  (ETHICON INC [US]; WATT PAUL WILLIAM [GB]; GREGORY SARA JAYNE [GB]; TRO) [X] 1,6,9,11-15 * page 1, line 3 - page 1, line 5 * * page 6, line 21 - page 6, line 32 * * page 8, line 4 - page 8, line 24 * * page 13, line 25 - page 13, line 30 * * page 15, line 23 - page 15, line 28 * * figures 3-7 * [Y] 2-5,7,8,10;
 [XY]WO0185248  (KCI LICENSING INC [US]; HUNT KENNETH WILLIAM [GB]; HEATON KEITH PATRIC) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,11,14,15 * page 1, paragraph 1st * * page 2, paragraph 3rd * * page 7, paragraph 3rd * * page 8, paragraph 3rd (full) * * page 10, paragraph 1st * * page 11, paragraph last * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,5,7,9,10,12,13;
 [Y]US2002115952  (JOHNSON ROYCE [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-15 *;
 [Y]US2002111576  (GREENE SHARON L [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * figures 3-5 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0027] , [0046] , [0080] *
International search[X]WO2005123170  (ETHICON INC [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004039415  (ZAMIEROWSKI DAVID S [US]);
 [Y]US6713083  (MCGREGOR JAMES [GB], et al);
 [Y]  - GRANDFILS ET AL., "Porous biomaterials tailored for cell culture", CYTOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 21, no. 1, XP008109896
by applicantUS4969880
 US5100396
 US5261893
 US5527293
 US6071267
 US5636643
 US5645081
 US5256418
 US5449383
 US5578662
 US5629186
 US5780281