Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2137537

EP2137537 - Compositions and Uses for Treating Multiple Sclerosis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/01]NRF2 SCREENING ASSAYS AND RELATED METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS
[2013/17]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2017Opposition withdrawnpublished on 26.04.2017  [2017/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biogen MA Inc.
250 Binney Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2015/24]
Former [2013/22]For all designated states
Biogen Idec MA Inc.
14 Cambridge Center
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
Biogen Idec MA, Inc.
14 Cambridge Center
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LUKASHEV, Matvey, E.
3 Louis Road
Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US
02 / O'NEILL, Gilmore
17 Grove Street
Medford, MA 02155 / US
 [2012/04]
Former [2010/01]01 / LUKASHEV, Matvey, E.
3 Louis Road
Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US
Representative(s)Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/22]Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2010/01]Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date08725256.507.02.2008
[2010/01]
WO2008US01602
Priority number, dateUS20070888921P08.02.2007         Original published format: US 888921 P
[2010/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008097596
Date:14.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2137537
Date:30.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008
[2010/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2137537
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2137537
Date:01.06.2016
[2016/22]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP11.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/225, A61K31/137, A61K31/194, A61K31/197, A61K31/277, A61K31/436, A61K31/4704, A61K31/7076, A61K38/21, A61K45/06, G01N33/50
[2016/17]
Former International [2016/15]A61K31/137, A61K31/194, A61K31/197, A61K31/225, A61K31/277, A61K31/436, A61K31/4704, A61K31/7076, A61K38/21, A61K45/06, G01N33/50
Former International [2010/01]G01N33/68
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/01]
Extension statesAL04.09.2009
BA04.09.2009
MK04.09.2009
RS04.09.2009
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen und deren Verwendung zur Behandlung von Multipler Sklerosis[2013/17]
English:Compositions and Uses for Treating Multiple Sclerosis[2013/17]
French:Compositions et leurs utilisations pour le traitement de la Sclérose en plaques[2013/17]
Former [2010/01]NRF2-SCREENING-ASSAYS SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN
Former [2010/01]NRF2 SCREENING ASSAYS AND RELATED METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS
Former [2010/01]ESSAIS DE CRIBLAGE DE NRF2 ET PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS CORRESPONDANTS
Entry into regional phase04.09.2009National basic fee paid 
04.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/53]
22.12.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2012Observations by third parties
11.02.2013Observations by third parties
20.02.2013Observations by third parties
27.02.2013Date of oral proceedings
06.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
06.03.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2013Observations by third parties
12.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2013Fee for grant paid
16.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12169644.7  / EP2518511
EP13156663.0  / EP2629097
EP13169139.6  / EP2653873
EP13179016.4  / EP2680006
EP13179021.4  / EP2680007
EP13179023.0  / EP2680008
EP13179024.8  / EP2680009
EP13179025.5  / EP2680010
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.08.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  12.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 02  13.02.2014  21.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  21.02.2014  26.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Pawloy, Peter Michael
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 04  26.02.2014  07.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Leonard, Thomas Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  27.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  27.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ZAKLADY FARMACEUTYCZNE POLPHARMA S.A.
ul. Peplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny
Pinsent Masons LLP
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London EC2A 4ES / GB
 07  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP
4 George Street
Llandeilo SA 19 6AS / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP
1 Sans Walk
London EC1R 0LT / GB
 08  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 10  28.02.2014  16.03.2017  WITHDRAWN
Forward Pharma A/S
Østergade 24A, 1.
1100 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann Strasse 23
80636 München / DE
 [2017/17]
Former [2016/13]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  12.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 02  13.02.2014  21.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  21.02.2014  26.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Pawloy, Peter Michael
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 04  26.02.2014  07.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Leonard, Thomas Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  27.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  27.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ZAKLADY FARMACEUTYCZNE POLPHARMA S.A.
ul. Peplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 07  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP
4 George Street
Llandeilo SA 19 6AS / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP
1 Sans Walk
London EC1R 0LT / GB
 08  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 10  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Forward Pharma A/S
Østergade 24A, 1.
1100 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann Strasse 23
80636 München / DE
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  12.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 02  13.02.2014  21.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  21.02.2014  26.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Pawloy, Peter Michael
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 04  26.02.2014  07.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
European Oppositions Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Leonard, Thomas Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  27.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  27.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ZAKLADY FARMACEUTYCZNE POLPHARMA S.A.
ul. Peplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 07  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP
4 George Street
Llandeilo SA 19 6AS / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP
1 Sans Walk
London EC1R 0LT / GB
 08  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
von Seebach, Malte
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 10  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Forward Pharma A/S
Østergade 24A, 1.
1100 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann Strasse 23
80636 München / DE
Former [2015/22]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  12.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 02  13.02.2014  21.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  21.02.2014  26.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Pawloy, Peter Michael
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 04  26.02.2014  07.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
European Opposition Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Leonard, Thomas Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  27.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  27.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ZAKLADY FARMACEUTYCZNE POLPHARMA S.A.
ul. Peplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 07  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP
4 George Street
Llandeilo SA 19 6AS / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP
1 Sans Walk
London EC1R 0LT / GB
 08  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
von Seebach, Malte
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 10  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Forward Pharma A/S
Østergade 24A, 1.
1100 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/11]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  12.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Goldbach, Klara
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  13.02.2014  21.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  21.02.2014  26.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Pawloy, Peter Michael
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 04  26.02.2014  07.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
European Opposition Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Leonard, Thomas Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  27.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  27.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ZAKLADY FARMACEUTYCZNE POLPHARMA S.A.
ul. Peplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 07  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP
4 George Street
Llandeilo SA 19 6AS / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP
1 Sans Walk
London EC1R 0LT / GB
 08  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
von Seebach, Malte
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 10  28.02.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Forward Pharma A/S
Østergade 24A, 1.
1100 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  12.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Goldbach, Klara
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  13.02.2014  21.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  21.02.2014  26.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Pawloy, Peter Michael
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 04  26.02.2014   
European Opposition Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Leonard, Thomas Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 05  27.02.2014   
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  27.02.2014   
ZAKLADY FARMACEUTYCZNE POLPHARMA S.A.
ul. Peplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 07  27.02.2014   
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP
4 George Street
Llandeilo SA 19 6AS / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Antony Xavier
Gallafents LLP 4 George St.
Llandeilo SA19 6AS / GB
 08  28.02.2014   
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
von Seebach, Malte
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  28.02.2014   
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
 10  28.02.2014   
Forward Pharma A/S
Østergade 24A, 1.
1100 Copenhagen K / DK
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/14]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  12.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Goldbach, Klara
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  13.02.2014  21.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  21.02.2014  26.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
G. L. Pharma GmbH
Schlossplatz 1
8502 Lannach / AT
Opponent's representative
Pawloy, Peter Michael
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 04  26.02.2014   
European Opposition Limited
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Opponent's representative
Leonard, Thomas Charles
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2014/13]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  12.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Goldbach, Klara
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  13.02.2014   
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2014/12]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  12.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Goldbach, Klara
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
08.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.06.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1773/16
24.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007005879  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [X] 1-8,12-14,16,17 * Pages 33-37,48-53 Claims 1,9,14 *;
 [X]  SCHIMRIGK S ET AL, "Oral fumaric acid esters for the treatment of active multiple sclerosis: an open-label, baseline-controlled pilot study", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NEUROLOGY, (200606), vol. 13, no. 6, ISSN 1351-5101, pages 604 - 610, XP002496537 [X] 13-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1468-1331.2006.01292.x
 [X]  WIERINCKX ET AL, "Detoxication enzyme inducers modify cytokine production in rat mixed glial cells", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, XX, (20050901), vol. 166, no. 1-2, ISSN 0165-5728, pages 132 - 143, XP005000427 [X] 1-6,8-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jneuroim.2005.05.013
ExaminationWO2006037342
    - GOLD R ET AL, "Safety of a novel oral single-agent fumarate, BG00012, in patients with relapsing-remitting multiple sclerosis: results of a phase 2 study", JOURNAL OF NEUROLOGY - ZEITSCHRIFT FUER NEUROLOGIE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (20060501), vol. 253, no. Suppl. 2, ISSN 0340-5354, pages II144 - II145, XP009157336
by applicantWO2006037342
 US4851439
 US5149695
 US5451667
 US5650135
 US6217847
 US6509376
 US6436992
    ALASTAIR COMPSTON ET AL., McAlpine's Multiple Sclerosis., 4th edition,, ELSEVIER,
    VAN MUISWINKEL ET AL., CURR. DRUG TARGETS CNS--NEUROL. DISORD., (2005), vol. 4, pages 267 - 281,
    MUISWINKEL ET AL., NEUROBIOL. AGING, (2004), vol. 25, page 1253,
    MUISWINKEL ET AL., CURR. DRUG TARGETS--CNS. NEUROL. DISORD., (2005), vol. 4, pages 267 - 281,
    VAN HORSSEN ET AL., FREE RADICAL BIOL. & MED., (2006), vol. 41, pages 311 - 311,
    SATOH ET AL., PNAS, (2006), vol. 103, no. 3, pages 768 - 773,
    MATTSON; CHENG, TRENDS IN NEUROSCI., (2006), vol. 29, no. 11, pages 632 - 639,
    KAPPOS ET AL., "BG00012, a novel oral fumarate is effective in patients with relapsing remitting multiple sclerosis", SAGE JOURNALS: MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, (200609), vol. 12, page 585,325,
    SCHIMRIGK ET AL., EUR. J. NEUROL., (2006), vol. 13, no. 6, pages 604 - 10,
    DRUGS R&D, (2005), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 229 - 30,
    "High-Throughput Screening in Drug Discovery", JORG HUSER, Methods and Principles in Medicinal Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS,
    "Solid-Supported Combinatorial and Parallel Synthesis of Small-Molecular-Weight Compound Libraries", TAN SALUSBURY, Tetrahedron Organic Chemistry, ELSEVIER,
    RICCARDO CORTESE, Combinatorial Libraries: Synthesis, Screening and Application Potential, WALTER DE GRUYTER,
    MITTOO, COMB. CHEM. & HIGH THROUGHPUT SCREEN, (2006), vol. 9, pages 421 - 423,
    DARLINGTON, CURR. OPIN. MOL. THER., (2005), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 598 - 603,
    WARREN ET AL., EUR. J. NEUROL., (2006), vol. 13, no. 8, pages 887 - 95,
    "Drugs and the Pharmaceutical Sciences", MILO GIBALDI ET AL., Pharmacokinetics, INFORMA HEALTHCARE,
    KWAK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, page 8135,
    CHEN; KUNSCH, CURR. PHARM. DESIGNS, (2004), vol. 10, pages 879 - 891,
    LEE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 14, pages 12029 - 38,
    RUSHMORE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, no. 18, pages 11632 - 9,
    NIOI ET AL., MUTATION RES., (2004), vol. 555, pages 14 - 171,
    DINKOVA-KOSTOVA ET AL., PNAS, (2005), vol. 102, no. 12, pages 4584 - 9,
    CHAN ET AL., PNAS, (1996), vol. 93, pages 13943 - 13948,
    KWAK ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2002), vol. 22, no. 9, pages 2883 - 2892,
    KWAK ET AL., MOL. MED., (2001), vol. 7, pages 135 - 145,
    KRAFT ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2004), vol. 24, pages 1101 - 1112,
    CALABRESE ET AL., J. NEUROSCI. RES., (2005), vol. 79, pages 509 - 521,
    WIERINCKX ET AL., J. NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 166, pages 132 - 143,
    DINKOVA-KOSTOVA ET AL., PNAS, (2001), vol. 98, pages 3404 - 09,
    PROCHASKA ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 169, pages 328 - 336,
    RAMOS-GOMEZ ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2004), vol. 24, no. 5, pages 1101 - 1112,
    HABIG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1974), vol. 219, pages 7130 - 7139,
    KWAK ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (2002), vol. 22, no. 9, pages 2883 - 2892,
    GAO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM.,
    SHIH ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2005), vol. 25, no. 44, pages 10321 - 35,
    MISGELD, HISTOCHEM. CELL BIOL., (2005), vol. 124, pages 189 - 196,
    SAMBROOK ET AL., Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, 2nd ed.,, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS,
    LODIE ET AL., TISSUE ENG., (2002), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 739 - 751,
    AUSUBEL ET AL., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS,
    HOFFMAN, LANCET ONCOL., (2002), vol. 3, pages 546 - 556,
    TUNG ET AL., CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 4953 - 4958,
    SHI ET AL., PNAS, (2001), vol. 98, pages 12754 - 12759,
    LUKE ET AL., J. VIROL., (2002), vol. 76, pages 12149 - 12161,
    LIANG ET AL., MOL. THER., (2002), vol. 6, pages 73 - 82,
    HEMMINKI ET AL., J. NAT. CANCER INST., (2002), vol. 94, pages 741 - 749,
    M. FLINT BEAL; ANTHONY E. LANG; ALBERT C. LUDOLPH, Neurodegenerative Diseases: Neurobiology, Pathogenesis and Therapeutics, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS,
    TUOHY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 141, pages 1126 - 1130,
    SOBEL ET AL., J. LMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 132, pages 2393 - 2401,
    TRAUGOTT, CELL LMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 119, pages 114 - 129,
    BAKER ET AL., J. NEUROIMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 28, page 261,
    BUTTER ET AL., J. NEUROL. SCI., (1991), vol. 104, page 9,
    HARRIS ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1991), vol. 29, page 548,
    KERMONDE ET AL., BRAIN, (1990), vol. 113, page 1477,
    BEN-NUN ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1981), vol. 11, pages 195 - 199,
    AND ET AL., CELLLMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 124, pages 132 - 143,
    ZAMVIL ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 317, pages 355 - 358,
    ZAMVIL ET AL., ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 8, pages 579 - 621,
    SOBEL ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 132, pages 2393 - 2401,
    ERCOLI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 175, pages 3293 - 3298,
    GERSHWIN ET AL.,, Immunologic Defects in Laboratory Animals, PLENUM PRESS,
    UNER ET AL., J. AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE, (1998), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 233 - 240,
    JI ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (1999), vol. 69, page 139,
    RIEMEKASTEN ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2001), vol. 44, no. 10, pages 2435 - 2445,
    BAXTER ET AL., AUTOIMMUNITY, (1991), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 61 - 67,
    LINKER ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 620 - 624,
    EUGSTER ET AL., NAT. MED., (1999), vol. 29, pages 626 - 632,
    GOLD ET AL., BRAIN, (2006), vol. 129, pages 1953 - 1971,
    FREIREICH ET AL., CANCER CHEMOTHER. REPORTS, (1966), vol. 50, no. 4, pages 219 - 244,
 US20030433295
 US20060421083
 US20040511564
otherWO2006037342