Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2132650

EP2132650 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING WITH A VIRTUAL WORLD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
2207 Bridgepointe Parkway
San Mateo, CA 94404 / US
For all designated states
Sony Interactive Entertainment Europe Limited
10 Great Marlborough Street
London W1F 7LP / GB
[2017/34]
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
2207 Bridgepointe Parkway
San Mateo, California 94404 / US
For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment Europe Limited
10 Great Marlborough Street
London W1F 7LP / GB
Former [2011/39]For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
919 East Hillsdale Boulevard
Foster City, CA 94404-2175 / US
For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment Europe Limited
10 Great Marlborough Street
London W1F 7LP / GB
Former [2009/51]For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.
919 East Hillsdale Boulevard 2nd Floor
Foster City CA 94404 / US
For all designated states
Sony Computer Entertainment Europe Limited
10 Great Marlborough Street
London W1F 7LP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / GILLO, Tomas
10 Great Malborough Street
London W1F 7LP / GB
02 / GOODWIN, Mitchell
10 Great Marlborough Street
London W1F 7LP / GB
03 / WAUGAMAN, Scott
10 Great Marlborough Street
London W1F 7LP / GB
04 / ZALEWSKY, Gary
919 E. Hillsdale Blvd. Second Floor
Foster City, California 94404 / US
05 / VASS, Attila
919 E. Hillsdale Blvd. Second Floor
Foster City, California 94404 / US
 [2009/51]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Turner, James Arthur
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date08730776.526.02.2008
[2009/51]
WO2008US55037
Priority number, dateGB2007000397401.03.2007         Original published format: GB 0703974
US20070892397P01.03.2007         Original published format: US 892397 P
GB2007000423505.03.2007         Original published format: GB 0704235
GB2007000422705.03.2007         Original published format: GB 0704227
GB2007000424605.03.2007         Original published format: GB 0704246
GB2007000422505.03.2007         Original published format: GB 0704225
US2007068228105.03.2007         Original published format: US 682281
US2007068228405.03.2007         Original published format: US 682284
US2007068228705.03.2007         Original published format: US 682287
US2007068229205.03.2007         Original published format: US 682292
US2007068229805.03.2007         Original published format: US 682298
US2007068229905.03.2007         Original published format: US 682299
[2009/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008109299
Date:12.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2132650
Date:16.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008
[2009/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.12.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/00, A63F13/12
[2010/43]
Former International [2009/51]G06F17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/51]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMMUNIKATION MIT EINER VIRTUELLEN WELT[2009/51]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING WITH A VIRTUAL WORLD[2009/51]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMUNIQUER AVEC UN MONDE VIRTUEL[2009/51]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2009National basic fee paid 
22.09.2009Search fee paid 
22.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/51]
13.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/22]
12.12.2018Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/22]
15.01.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.06.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1216733  (ARUZE CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0088] *;
 [Y]WO0242921  (BUTTERFLY NET INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 20 - page 6, line 18 * * page 17, line 1 - line 26 *;
 [A]WO0070557  (GRAPHIC GEMS [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 20 * * page 10, line 31 - page 12, line 30 * * page 13, line 26 - page 14, line 31 * * claims 1-9 * * figures 4,6-8,10,11 *;
 [A]WO2006056231  (NOKIA CORP [FI]; ARRASVUORI JUHA [FI]; HURSKAINEN MIKKO [FI]; KANKAINE) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] *
 [Y]  - BASET S A ET AL, "An Analysis of the Skype Peer-to-Peer Internet Telephony Protocol", INFOCOM 2006. 25TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICA TIONS. PROCEEDINGS, IEEE, PI LNKD- DOI:10.1109/INFOCOM.2006.312, (20060401), ISBN 978-1-4244-0221-2, pages 1 - 11, XP031072352 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * Introduction paragraph. PC-PSTN bridging specifically.; page 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFOCOM.2006.312
 [A]  - RICHARD A BARTLE, "Designing Virtual Worlds", 19000101, (19000101), XP002478211 [A] 1-15 * page 17 - page 31 *
International search[X]US5926179  (MATSUDA SATORU [JP], et al);
 [Y]US6976846  (DUPONT ANNE [US], et al);
 [Y]US6834389  (GLASS GRAHAM W [US]);
 [Y]US6836515  (KAY STANLEY E [US], et al)
by applicantEP1216733
    - BASET ET AL., "An analysis of the Skype Peer-to-Peer Internet Telephony Protocol", INFOCOM 2006, 25TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, PROCEEDINGS IEEE, (200604), doi:doi:10.1109/INFOCOM.2006.312, pages 1 - 11, XP031072352

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFOCOM.2006.312
 US20050238077
 US20050238095
 US20050238086
 US20050238087
 US20050257761
 US20060461390
 US20060245853
 GB20030004024
 GB20030004022
 US20060381724
 US20060381725
 US20060381729
 US20060429414
 US20040759782