Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2248406

EP2248406 - HEAT SINK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.10.2013
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[2010/45]
Inventor(s)01 / JOSHI, Shailesh N.
11445 Compaq Center Drive W
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
02 / FARNSWORTH, Arthur K.
11445 Compaq Center Drive W
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
 [2010/45]
Representative(s)Rees, Simon John Lewis , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/45]Rees, Simon John Lewis , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date08730843.327.02.2008
[2010/45]
WO2008US55126
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009108192
Date:03.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2248406
Date:10.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009
[2010/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR03.09.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/427, H01L23/467
[2012/43]
Former International [2010/45]H05K7/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/45]
TitleGerman:KÜHLKÖRPER-EINRICHTUNG[2010/45]
English:HEAT SINK DEVICE[2010/45]
French:DISSIPATEUR THERMIQUE[2010/45]
Entry into regional phase24.08.2010National basic fee paid 
24.08.2010Search fee paid 
24.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/45]
20.04.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/45]
06.06.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005225943  (SHIH JUNG-SUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,6-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027]; figure 2 *;
 [X]US2006196640  (SIU WING M [HK]) [X] 1-10,12-15 * paragraph [0060]; figures 8,10 *;
 [X]US2005028965  (CHEN CHING-CHIH [TW]) [X] 1-5,8-10,14,15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; figures 3,5A *;
 [X]US5216580  (DAVIDSON HOWARD L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-15 * line 43 - column 4, line 45; figures 1A,2 *
International search[A]US7193851  (YATSKOV ALEXANDER I [US]);
 [A]US7184269  (CAMPBELL LEVI A [US], et al);
 [A]US6966361  (CONNORS MATTHEW JOSEPH [US]);
 [A]US6714413  (GHOSH DEBASHIS [US], et al)