Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2232493

EP2232493 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CALIBRATING WRITE TIMING IN A MEMORY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rambus Inc.
1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2010/50]
Former [2010/39]For all designated states
Rambus Inc.
4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GIOVANNINI, Thomas
c/o Rambus Inc.
Attn: Ms Ann Williams
4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos CA 94022 / US
02 / GUPTA, Alok
c/o Rambus Inc.
Attn: Ms Ann Williams
4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos CA 94022 / US
03 / SHAEFFER, Ian
c/o Rambus Inc.
Attn: Ms Ann Williams
4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos CA 94022 / US
04 / WOO, Steven C.
c/o Rambus Inc.
Attn: Ms Ann Williams
4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos CA 94022 / US
 [2018/19]
Former [2010/39]01 / GIOVANNINI, Thomas
c/o Rambus Inc. Attn: Ms Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos CA 94022 / US
02 / GUPTA, Alok
c/o Rambus Inc. Attn: Ms Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos CA 94022 / US
03 / SHAEFFER, Ian
c/o Rambus Inc. Attn: Ms Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos CA 94022 / US
04 / WOO, Steven C.
c/o Rambus Inc. Attn: Ms Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real
Los Altos CA 94022 / US
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[2018/19]
Former [2010/39]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date08731251.803.03.2008
[2010/39]
WO2008US55661
Priority number, dateUS2007001631721.12.2007         Original published format: US 16317
[2010/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009082502
Date:02.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2232493
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009
[2010/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2232493
Date:09.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G11C11/4076, G11C7/10, G11C11/409, G11C11/4096, G06F3/06, G06F1/08, G06F5/06
[2017/49]
Former International [2010/39]G11C7/22, G11C11/40
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/19]
Former [2010/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KALIBRIEREN DES SCHREIBTIMINGS IN EINEM SPEICHERSYSTEM[2010/39]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CALIBRATING WRITE TIMING IN A MEMORY SYSTEM[2010/39]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ÉTALONNER UNE TEMPORISATION D'ÉCRITURE DANS UN SYSTÈME MÉMOIRE[2010/39]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2010National basic fee paid 
21.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
03.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2018Fee for grant paid
22.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18169715.2  / EP3399523
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.08.2012
Opposition(s)12.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/11]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
NO09.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]US6735709  (LEE TERRY R [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 2; figures 9A,9B * * column 8, line 8 - column 9, line 47; figures 1,10A,10B,11 *;
 [A]US2005174878  (OSAKA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-37 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0080]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2002129215  (YOO CHANG-SIK [KR], et al) [A] 1-37 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-5 *
ExaminationUS2005071707
 US2006262613
by applicantUS6735709
 US2005174878