Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2126902

EP2126902 - SPEECH RECOGNITION OF SPEECH RECORDED BY A MOBILE COMMUNICATION FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.05.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change - applicantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuance Communications, Inc.
1 Wayside Road
Burlington, MA 01803 / US
[2019/41]
Former [2009/49]For all designated states
Vlingo Corporation
17 Dunster Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CERRA, Joseph, P.
43 Taber Knolls
Pawling, NY 12564 / US
02 / KISHCHENKO, Roman, V.
1 Watermill Place 310
Arlington, MA 02476 / US
03 / NGUYEN, John, N.
6 Upland Road West
Arlington, MA 02476 / US
04 / PHILLIPS, Michael, S.
39 Howells Road
Belmont, MA 02478 / US
05 / SHU, Han
101 Longwood Avenue, Apt. 3
Brookline, MA 02446 / US
 [2009/49]
Representative(s)Gibbs, Richard , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Naismith, Robert Stewart , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
Application number, filing date08731692.307.03.2008
[2009/49]
WO2008US56242
Priority number, dateUS20070893600P07.03.2007         Original published format: US 893600 P
US20070976050P28.09.2007         Original published format: US 976050 P
US2007086569201.10.2007         Original published format: US 865692
US2007086569401.10.2007         Original published format: US 865694
US2007086569701.10.2007         Original published format: US 865697
US20070977143P03.10.2007         Original published format: US 977143 P
US2007086677703.10.2007         Original published format: US 866777
US2007086680403.10.2007         Original published format: US 866804
US2007086675503.10.2007         Original published format: US 866755
US2007086667503.10.2007         Original published format: US 866675
US2007086681803.10.2007         Original published format: US 866818
US2007086670403.10.2007         Original published format: US 866704
US2007086672503.10.2007         Original published format: US 866725
[2009/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008109835
Date:12.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2126902
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008
[2009/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/28, G10L15/06, G10L15/26, H04M3/493
[2011/29]
Former International [2009/49]G10L19/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/49]
TitleGerman:SPRACHERKENNUNG UND SPRACHAUFNAHME IN EINER MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSANORDNUNG[2009/49]
English:SPEECH RECOGNITION OF SPEECH RECORDED BY A MOBILE COMMUNICATION FACILITY[2009/49]
French:RECONNAISSANCE DE PAROLES ENREGISTRÉES PAR UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE[2009/49]
Entry into regional phase05.10.2009National basic fee paid 
05.10.2009Search fee paid 
05.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/49]
17.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2015Date of oral proceedings
21.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.01.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination26.03.2015Appeal received No.  T1427/15
28.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.10.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
29.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1104155  (PHONE COM INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7,8,11-13,16,17,20 * column 3, lines 3-21 * * column 3, lines 31-50 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 1 * * column 6, line 57 - column 8, line 7 * * column 6, lines 18-39 * * column 8, lines 3-8 * * column 8, lines 16-35 * * column 11, line 34 - column 12, line 8 * * column 13, lines 4-18 * * column 14, lines 8-10 * * column 18, lines 25-30 * [I] 5,6,9,10,14,15,18,19;
 [A]WO03054859  (MUREX SECURITIES LTD [GB], et al) [A] 7-9,16-18 * page 16, line 3 - page 17, line 12 * * page 18, line 35 - page 19, line 6 *;
 [A]US2006009974  (JUNQUA JEAN-CLAUDE [US], et al) [A] 7-10,16-19 * paragraphs [0007] , [0016] , [0020] , [0025] , [0028] , [0034] - [0035] *;
 [A]US2002087315  (LEE VICTOR WAI LEUNG [CA], et al) [A] 7-10,16-19 * paragraphs [0013] , [0022] - [0026] - [0034] *