Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2126902


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.09.2019 Change - applicant published on  09.10.2019  [2019/41]
16.04.2019 Change - representative
02.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.04.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.07.2015 Change: Appeal number
29.05.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
28.03.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
28.03.2015 New entry: Appeal number
13.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.01.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.01.2015 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
21.05.2014 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.05.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.02.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.10.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.10.2012 First examination report
13.07.2012 Change - extension states published on  15.08.2012  [2012/33]
19.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2012 Amendment by applicant
17.06.2011 Supplementary search report published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
17.06.2011 Change - classification published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
17.06.2011 Change - classification published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
22.03.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.10.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.12.2009  [2009/49]
30.10.2009 Request for examination filed published on  02.12.2009  [2009/49]
27.10.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
13.10.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
07.10.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
07.10.2009 Amendment by applicant
26.09.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
16.09.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
30.04.2008 PCT data prior to European publication