Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2126902
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011060587Global Dossier 10.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US87041110 27.08.2010
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011054900Global Dossier 03.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US87045310 27.08.2010
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011054899Global Dossier 03.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US87036810 27.08.2010
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011054898Global Dossier 03.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US87013810 27.08.2010
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011054897Global Dossier 03.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US87011210 27.08.2010
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011054896Global Dossier 03.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US87007110 27.08.2010
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011054895Global Dossier 03.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US87002510 27.08.2010
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011054894Global Dossier 03.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US87000810 27.08.2010
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2009030697Global Dossier 29.01.2009A1
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US86680407 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US3479408 07.03.2008
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2009030691Global Dossier 29.01.2009A1
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2009030688Global Dossier 29.01.2009A1
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2009030687Global Dossier 29.01.2009A1
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US3479408 07.03.2008
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2009030685Global Dossier 29.01.2009A1
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US18446508 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008312934Global Dossier 18.12.2008A1
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008288252Global Dossier 20.11.2008A1
Priority number Date
US4472308 07.03.2008
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4476608 07.03.2008
US4474808 07.03.2008
US4472508 07.03.2008
US4457308 07.03.2008
US4470108 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US4475208 07.03.2008
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US4479308 07.03.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US4479108 07.03.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US3479408 07.03.2008
US4476708 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008221902Global Dossier 11.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
US86681807 03.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008221901Global Dossier 11.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008221900Global Dossier 11.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
US97605007 28.09.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008221899Global Dossier 11.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008221898Global Dossier 11.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
US86667507 03.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008221889Global Dossier 11.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
US86680407 03.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008221884Global Dossier 11.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
US97605007 28.09.2007
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008221880Global Dossier 11.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
US86670407 03.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10056077Global Dossier 21.08.2018B2
US2009030698 29.01.2009A1
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
US86681807 03.10.2007
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US3479408 07.03.2008
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9619572Global Dossier 11.04.2017B2
US2015100314 09.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US201414570404 15.12.2014
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US87022110 27.08.2010
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9495956Global Dossier 15.11.2016B2
US2015073802 12.03.2015A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US201414537418 10.11.2014
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8996379Global Dossier 31.03.2015B2
US2008221879 11.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
US97605007 28.09.2007
US86569407 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8949266Global Dossier 03.02.2015B2
US2011055256 03.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US87022110 27.08.2010
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8949130Global Dossier 03.02.2015B2
US2010106497 29.04.2010A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8886545Global Dossier 11.11.2014B2
US2010185448 22.07.2010A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8886540Global Dossier 11.11.2014B2
US2009030684 29.01.2009A1
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US3479408 07.03.2008
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8880405Global Dossier 04.11.2014B2
US2008221897 11.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8838457Global Dossier 16.09.2014B2
US2009030696 29.01.2009A1
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US12395208 20.05.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18434208 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US3479408 07.03.2008
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8635243Global Dossier 21.01.2014B2
US2011066634 17.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US4457308 07.03.2008
US86569407 01.10.2007
US18437508 01.08.2008
US86569707 01.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US18435908 01.08.2008
US18446508 01.08.2008
US97605007 28.09.2007
US14607309 21.01.2009
US60344609 21.10.2009
US97714307 03.10.2007
US86677707 03.10.2007
US10701508 21.10.2008
US87025710 27.08.2010
US12395208 20.05.2008
US18434208 01.08.2008
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US18449008 01.08.2008
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US18428208 01.08.2008
US69150410 21.01.2010
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US18428608 01.08.2008
US18451208 01.08.2008
US3479408 07.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2126902Global Dossier 20.07.2011A4
EP2126902 02.12.2009A2
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US86569407 01.10.2007
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
WO2008US56242 07.03.2008
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US97714307 03.10.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2008109835Global Dossier 12.09.2008A2
Priority number Date
US86677707 03.10.2007
US86672507 03.10.2007
US86670407 03.10.2007
US86569407 01.10.2007
US86569707 01.10.2007
US89360007 07.03.2007
US86675507 03.10.2007
US86681807 03.10.2007
US86680407 03.10.2007
US86667507 03.10.2007
US86569207 01.10.2007
US97605007 28.09.2007
US97714307 03.10.2007