Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2203462 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2203462



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 18682
04.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.11.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
27.11.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 11
10.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 10
09.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.08.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
09.08.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
09.08.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
09.08.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 4
09.08.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
09.08.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 16
08.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
08.08.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
08.08.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 34
08.08.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
07.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.08.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
07.08.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
07.08.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 3
02.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 10
28.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.07.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
12.06.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
06.06.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
01.06.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 22
01.06.2017 Refund of fees Appeal 1
31.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.03.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 10
30.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
29.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 10
22.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.03.2017 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.2017 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
20.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 10
10.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.03.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
10.03.2017 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 27
10.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 27
10.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
10.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
10.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
09.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Claims Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 30
09.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
09.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
08.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
07.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
07.03.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
15.02.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
09.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.02.2017 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
16.01.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 11
16.01.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 11
16.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 10
11.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.01.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.01.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 11
09.01.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 11
09.01.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 11
09.01.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 11
09.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 10
09.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
09.01.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.01.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
03.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.01.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.01.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 2
29.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.12.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
26.12.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.12.2016 Request for a change of address - opponent Appeal 3
23.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
23.12.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
19.12.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 11
16.12.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 11
14.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
14.12.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
13.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.12.2016 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.12.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
13.12.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Request for correction Opposition 1
17.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.11.2016 Request for correction Opposition 1
16.11.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
16.11.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
16.11.2016 Request for correction Opposition 3
16.11.2016 Request for correction Opposition 3
15.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
08.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.11.2016 Request for correction Opposition 2
02.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 17
31.10.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 47
31.10.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 37
31.10.2016 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
31.10.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
31.10.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
31.10.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
31.10.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 2
31.10.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.10.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.09.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
29.09.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 3
29.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.09.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
23.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
23.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
21.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
13.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
08.09.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.09.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.09.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
05.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 61
05.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
05.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
05.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 71
05.09.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 145
02.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.09.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
02.09.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.09.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.09.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.09.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.09.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
29.08.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
29.08.2016 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.08.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
15.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 114
15.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
04.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
04.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
04.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
04.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
04.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
04.08.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 22
04.08.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 22
04.08.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 22
04.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
04.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
04.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
04.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
03.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
03.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 114
03.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 114
03.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
03.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
03.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.08.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
03.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
03.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
03.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 24
03.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 24
03.08.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 26
02.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.07.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2016 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
20.07.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.07.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.03.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
23.02.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 3
09.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.02.2016 General authorisation Opposition 1
08.02.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
04.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 12
28.01.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.01.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 4
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
11.12.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
11.12.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
11.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 134
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 94
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 25
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 31
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 24
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 24
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 134
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 25
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 94
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 31
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 5
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 55
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 55
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
11.12.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 114
11.12.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
04.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.08.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
03.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.08.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.08.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
31.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
31.07.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
31.07.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
02.07.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
09.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
09.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
09.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
09.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
09.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
09.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
09.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
09.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
09.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
09.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
07.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 2
02.04.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 2
02.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
01.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.04.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
01.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
01.04.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.03.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
03.03.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.03.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.03.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.03.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.03.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.02.2015 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
23.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 43
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 43
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 656
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 745
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 745
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
23.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 40
23.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
23.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 25
23.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
23.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
23.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
23.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
23.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 228
23.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 751
23.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 145
23.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 124
23.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.02.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.02.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.02.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.02.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
20.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
20.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
20.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
20.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
20.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
20.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 145
20.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 228
19.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.02.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
19.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
19.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 42
19.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
19.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 228
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 657
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 147
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 751
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 751
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 59
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 59
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 657
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 150
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 124
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 150
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 201
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 147
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 201
19.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 751
18.02.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 292
10.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 292
10.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.02.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
10.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
10.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
10.02.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
10.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 124
10.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 124
10.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 228
10.02.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 228
02.06.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.05.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
21.05.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
11.04.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.04.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.04.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.04.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.04.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 75
14.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.01.2014 Claims Search / examination 1
14.01.2014 Description Search / examination 74
14.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.01.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.12.2013 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
11.12.2013 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
05.11.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.11.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
22.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.10.2013 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.12.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.12.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
10.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.12.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
10.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.12.2012 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
04.12.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.11.2012 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
07.11.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.10.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
30.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
30.10.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
30.10.2012 Annex Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.10.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
05.10.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
31.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.08.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 6
31.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.08.2012 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
16.11.2010 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
26.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
25.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.10.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
25.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.10.2010 Request for further processing Search / examination 8
25.08.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
09.06.2010 Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
09.06.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.05.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
20.05.2010 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
23.04.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 17
30.03.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
30.03.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
30.03.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 10
08.12.2009 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
03.12.2009 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
18.11.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.10.2009 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
28.09.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
25.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.09.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
13.08.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
29.10.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 657
29.10.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 46
29.10.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 746
09.10.2008 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 751
26.06.2008 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
18.04.2008 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
18.04.2008 Claims International Searching Authority 53
18.04.2008 Description International Searching Authority 697