Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2203462

EP2203462 - NUCLEOSIDE PHOSPHORAMIDATE PRODRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.04.2014
Database last updated on 20.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2017Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gilead Pharmasset LLC
Gilead Sciences, Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
[2013/03]
Former [2012/45]For all designated states
Gilead Pharmasset LLC
303A College Road East
Princeton, NJ 08450 / US
Former [2010/27]For all designated states
Pharmasset, Inc.
303A College Road East
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SOFIA, Michael, Joseph
3066 Antler Road
Doylestown, PA 18902 / US
02 / DU, Jinfa
1206 Reins Circle
New Hope, PA 18938 / US
03 / WANG, Peiyuan
20 Radburn Road
Glen Rock, NJ 07452 / US
04 / NAGARATHNAM, Dhanapalan
52 Virginia Rail Drive
Bethany, CT 06524 / US
 [2010/27]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2013/03]Walker, Ross Thomson
Forresters
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2010/27]Pons Ariño, Angel
Glorieta Ruben Dario 4
28010 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date08732818.326.03.2008
[2010/27]
WO2008US58183
Priority number, dateUS20070909315P30.03.2007         Original published format: US 909315 P
US20070982309P24.10.2007         Original published format: US 982309 P
US2008005301521.03.2008         Original published format: US 53015
[2010/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008121634
Date:09.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2203462
Date:07.07.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008
[2010/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2203462
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/21]
Search report(s)International search reportEP20.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/7064, A61K31/7076
[2014/16]
Former International [2010/27]C07H19/10, C07H19/20, C07H19/04, C07H19/06, A61K31/7064, A61K31/7076, A61K31/706, A61P31/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/27]
TitleGerman:NUKLEOSID-PHOSPHORAMIDAT-PRODRUGS[2010/27]
English:NUCLEOSIDE PHOSPHORAMIDATE PRODRUGS[2010/27]
French:PROMÉDICAMENTS DE PHOSPHORAMIDATE DE NUCLÉOSIDE[2010/27]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2009National basic fee paid 
25.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2009Examination requested  [2010/27]
25.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
25.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.12.2013Observations by third parties
14.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2014Fee for grant paid
11.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14151876.1  / EP2792680
EP14169060.2  / EP2801580
EP14179358.8  / EP2826784
EP14179593.0  / EP2824109
EP15165114.8  / EP2933260
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
MEDECINS DU MONDE
62 Rue Marcadet
75018 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Vial, Lionel
Cabinet Lionel Vial
6 rue de Vaugondran
91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
 02  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Fleischer, Holm Herbert
Am Lingenstock 17
51515 Kürten / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
 03  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ELLIS IP LTD
Newbyth House East Linton East Lothian
EH40 3DU / GB
Opponent's representative
Ellis, Michael James
Ellis IP Ltd
53/4 George Street
Edinburgh EH2 2HT / GB
 04  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Pharmaceutical Works POLPHARMA
Pelplinska Str. 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 05  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 07  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
I P S Intellectual Property Services
11 Rue La Fayette
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
 08  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
 10  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2017/06]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
MEDECINS DU MONDE
62 rue Marcadet
75018 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Vial, Lionel
Cabinet Lionel Vial
6 rue de Vaugondran
91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
 02  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Fleischer, Holm Herbert
Am Lingenstock 17
51515 Kürten / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
 03  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ELLIS IP LTD
Newbyth House East Linton East Lothian
EH40 3DU / GB
Opponent's representative
Ellis, Michael James
Ellis IP Ltd
53/4 George Street
Edinburgh EH2 2HT / GB
 04  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Pharmaceutical Works POLPHARMA
Pelplinska Str. 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 05  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 07  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
I P S Intellectual Property Services
11 Rue La Fayette
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
 08  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
 10  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2016/44]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
MEDECINS DU MONDE
62 rue Marcadet
75018 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Vial, Lionel
Cabinet Lionel Vial
6 rue de Vaugondran
91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
 02  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Fleischer, Holm Herbert
Am Lingenstock 17
51515 Kürten / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
 03  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ELLIS IP LTD
Newbyth House East Linton East Lothian
EH40 3DU / GB
Opponent's representative
Ellis, Michael James
Ellis IP Ltd
Newbyth House
East Linton
East Lothian EH40 3DU / GB
 04  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Pharmaceutical Works POLPHARMA
Pelplinska Str. 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 05  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 07  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Intellectual Property Services (IPS)
7, rue Ambroise Thomas
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
 08  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
 10  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2016/38]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
MEDECINS DU MONDE
62 rue Marcadet
75018 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Vial, Lionel
Cabinet Lionel Vial
6 rue de Vaugondran
91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
 02  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Fleischer, Holm Herbert
Am Lingenstock 17
51515 Kürten / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
 03  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ELLIS IP LTD
Newbyth House East Linton East Lothian
EH40 3DU / GB
Opponent's representative
Ellis, Michael James
Ellis IP Ltd
Newbyth House
East Linton
East Lothian EH40 3DU / GB
 04  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Pharmaceutical Works POLPHARMA
Pelplinska Str. 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 05  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 07  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Intellectual Property Services (IPS)
7, rue Ambroise Thomas
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
 08  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
 10  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Huenges, Martin
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2016/12]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
MEDECINS DU MONDE
62 rue Marcadet
75018 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Vial, Lionel
Cabinet Lionel Vial
6 rue de Vaugondran
91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
 02  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Fleischer, Holm Herbert
Am Lingenstock 17
51515 Kürten / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ELLIS IP LTD
Newbyth House East Linton East Lothian
EH40 3DU / GB
Opponent's representative
Ellis, Michael James
Ellis IP Ltd
Newbyth House
East Linton
East Lothian EH40 3DU / GB
 04  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Pharmaceutical Works POLPHARMA
Pelplinska Str. 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 05  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 07  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Intellectual Property Services (IPS)
7, rue Ambroise Thomas
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
 08  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
 10  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Huenges, Martin
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2015/41]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
MEDECINS DU MONDE
62 rue Marcadet
75018 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Vial, Lionel
Cabinet Lionel Vial
6 rue de Vaugondran
91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
 02  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Fleischer, Holm Herbert
Am Lingenstock 17
51515 Kürten / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ELLIS IP LTD
Newbyth House East Linton East Lothian
EH40 3DU / GB
Opponent's representative
Ellis, Michael James
Ellis IP Ltd
Newbyth House
East Linton
East Lothian EH40 3DU / GB
 04  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Pharmaceutical Works POLPHARMA
Pelplinska Str. 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 05  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 07  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Intellectual Property Services (IPS)
7, rue Ambroise Thomas
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
 08  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Wittkopp, Alexander
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
 10  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Huenges, Martin
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2015/14]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
MEDECINS DU MONDE
62 rue Marcadet
75018 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Vial, Lionel
Cabinet Lionel Vial
6 rue de Vaugondran
91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
 02  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Fleischer, Holm Herbert
Am Lingenstock 17
51515 Kürten / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  19.02.2015  24.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ELLIS IP LTD
Newbyth House East Linton East Lothian
EH40 3DU / GB
Opponent's representative
Ellis, Michael James
Ellis IP Ltd
Newbyth House
East Linton
East Lothian EH40 3DU / GB
 04  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Pharmaceutical Works POLPHARMA
Pelplinska Str. 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 05  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Ltd (trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1 AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 06  20.02.2015  25.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 07  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Intellectual Property Services (IPS)
7, rue Ambroise Thomas
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
 08  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Wittkopp, Alexander
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 09  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
 10  23.02.2015  26.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Huenges, Martin
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2015/13]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
MEDECINS DU MONDE
62 rue Marcadet
75018 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Vial, Lionel
Cabinet Lionel Vial
6 rue de Vaugondran
91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
 02  19.02.2015   
Fleischer, Holm Herbert
Am Lingenstock 17
51515 Kürten / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2015/12]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2015   
MEDECINS DU MONDE
62 rue Marcadet
75018 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Vial, Lionel
Cabinet Lionel Vial
6 rue de Vaugondran
91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR
02.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
31.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition23.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2643/16
10.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
04.01.2016Appeal received No.  T2643/16
10.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
03.01.2016Appeal received No.  T2643/16
10.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
09.01.2017Appeal received No.  T2643/16
09.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
26.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2643/16
09.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
13.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2643/16
08.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
14.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2643/16
07.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
29.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2643/16
Request for further processing for:25.10.2010Request for further processing filed
25.10.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.11.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO2006012078  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,6,8,10,12 * claims 2-16 *;
 [DX]WO2006065335  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,6,8,10,12 * claims 3-6 * * page 8, lines 6-17 *;
 [X]US6475985  (WAGNER CARSTON R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10,12 * Compound of formula V * * figures 5,8 *;
 [X]WO03000713  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10,12 * Compound of formula (I) *; page 3 * * page 7, lines 34-42 *;
 [DX]WO2005012327  (UNIV CARDIFF [GB], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,6,8,10,12 * claims 1,7,17 * * page 4, lines 20-23 *;
 [X]WO2007020193  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10,12 * claim - *;
 [YD]US2006241064  (ROBERTS CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [YD] 1,2,4,6,8,10,12 * claims 19-37 * * claim 42; page 69 * * pages 60-62; examples 6,11-15 * * page 45, paragraphs 160,161 *;
 [Y]WO2005003147  (PHARMASSET LTD [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6,8,10,12 * claims 6-8,4-15,21-23,25-,26,28-30,36-38 * * claims 40,41,43-45,51-53,55-60,66-68 * * claims 1-71,73-75,81-83,85,86,88-90,96,97 * * claims 100,101,103-106,108-110,112-114 * * claims 116-118, 120-121, 126-127, 129 *;
 [DPX]WO2007095269  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [DPX] 1,2,4,6,8,10,12 * claim - *
 [X]  - GUNIC ET AL, "6-Hydrazinopurine 2'-methyl ribonucleosides and their 5'-monophosphate prodrugs as potent hepatitis C virus inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, Online, (20070214), vol. 17, no. 9, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2456 - 2458, XP022015324 [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10,12 * compounds 34A-41A * * compounds 34B-42B * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2007.02.029
by applicantWO9712033
 US2006241064
 WO2007095269
 WO2005003147
 US6180134
 US5192549
 US5376380
 US6060080
 US6132763
 WO2008010921
 EP1881001
 WO2007015824
 WO2007014925
 WO2007014926
 WO2007014921
 WO2007014920
 WO2007014922
 US2005267018
 WO2005095403
 WO2005037214
 WO2004094452
 US2003187018
 WO03064456
 WO2005028502
 WO03006490
 US2007275947
 US2759300
 WO2007092000
 WO2007076034
 WO2007002602
 US2005098125
 WO2006093801
 US2006166964
 WO2006065590
 WO2006065335
 US2006040927
 US2006040890
 WO2006020082
 WO2006012078
 WO2005123087
 US2005154056
 US2004229840
 WO2004065367
 WO2004003138
 WO2004002977
 WO2004002944
 WO2004002940
 WO2004000858
 WO03105770
 WO03010141
 WO02057425
 WO02057287
 WO2005021568
 WO2004041201
 US2006293306
 US2006194749
 US6784166
 WO2007088148
 WO2007039142
 WO2005103045
 WO2007039145
 WO2004096210
 WO03037895
 WO2007070556
 WO2005067900
 US2006276511
 WO2006120252
 WO2006120251
 WO2006100310
 WO2006035061
 WO2007093901
 WO2004035571
 WO2004014852
 WO2004014313
 WO2004009020
 WO03101993
 WO0006529
 US2006142238
 US2005009737
 US2006199783
 US2006122146
 US2007197463
    - K. ISHI ET AL., HEPTOLOGY, (1999), vol. 29, pages 1227 - 1235,
    - V. LOHMANN ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1998), vol. 249, pages 108 - 118,
    - CALISHER ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL, (1993), vol. 70, pages 37 - 43,
    - FIELDS, B. N., KNIPE, D. M., AND HOWLEY, P. M.,, Fields Virology, LIPPINCOTT-RAVEN PUBLISHERS, (1996), pages 931 - 959,
    - HALSTEAD, S. B., REV. INFECT. DIS., (1984), vol. 6, pages 251 - 264,
    - HALSTEAD, S. B., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 476 - 481,
    - MONATH, T. P., NEW ENG. J. MED, (1988), vol. 319, no. 64, pages 1 - 643,
    - MOENNIG, V. ET AL., ADV. VIR. RES., (1992), vol. 41, pages 53 - 98,
    - MEYERS, G.; THIEL, H.J., ADVANCES IN VIRUS RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 47, pages 53 - 118,
    - MOENNIG V. ET AL., ADV. VIR. RES., (1992), vol. 41, pages 53 - 98,
    - GORBALENYA ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 333, page 22,
    - BAZAN; FLETTERICK, VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 171, pages 637 - 639,
    - GORBALENYA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 3889 - 3897,
    - KOONIN, E.V.; DOLJA, V.V., CRIR. REV. BIOCHEM. MOLEC. BIOL., (1993), vol. 28, pages 375 - 430,
    - WISKERCHEN; COLLETT, VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 184, pages 341 - 350,
    - BARTENSCHLAGER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 3835 - 3844,
    - ECKART ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1993), vol. 192, pages 399 - 406,
    - GRAKOUI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 2832 - 2843,
    - GRAKOUI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 10583 - 10587,
    - HIJIKATA ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 4665 - 4675,
    - TOME ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 4017 - 4026,
    - BARTENSCHLAGER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 5045 - 5055,
    - FAILLA ET AL., J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 3753 - 3760,
    - XU ET AL., J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, no. 53, pages 12 - 5322,
    - KIM ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1995), vol. 215, pages 160 - 166,
    - JIN; PETERSON, ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1995), vol. 323, pages 47 - 53,
    - WARRENER; COLLETT, J. VIROL., (1995), vol. 69, pages 1720 - 1726,
    - BEHRENS ET AL., EMBO, (1996), vol. 15, pages 12 - 22,
    - LECHMANN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, pages 8416 - 8428,
    - YUAN ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1997), vol. 232, pages 231 - 235,
    - ZHONG ET AL., J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 9365 - 9369,
    - TAN, S.-L. ET AL., NATURE REV. DRUG DISCOV., (2002), vol. 1, pages 867 - 881,
    - WALKER, M.P. ET AL., EXP. OPIN. INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (2003), vol. 12, pages 1269 - 1280,
    - NI, Z-J. ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN DRUG DISCOVERY AND DEVELOPMENT, (2004), vol. 7, pages 446 - 459,
    - BEAULIEU, P. L. ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (2004), vol. 5, pages 838 - 850,
    - WU, J. ET AL., CURRENT DRUG TARGETS-INFECTIOUS DISORDERS, (2003), vol. 3, pages 207 - 219,
    - GRIFFITH, R.C. ET AL., ANNUAL REPORTS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 39, pages 223 - 237,
    - CARROL, S. ET AL., INFECTIOUS DISORDERS-DRUG TARGETS, (2006), vol. 6, pages 17 - 29,
    - MCGUIGAN, C. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 1748 - 1753,
    - VALETTE, G. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 1981 - 1990,
    - BALZARINI, J. ET AL., PROC. NATIONAL ACAD SCI USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 7295 - 7299,
    - SIDDIQUI, A. Q. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1999), vol. 42, pages 4122 - 4128,
    - EISENBERG, E. J. ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES AND NUCLEIC ACIDS, (2001), vol. 20, pages 1091 - 1098,
    - LEE, W.A. ET AL., ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (2005), vol. 49, page 1898,
    - CLARK, J. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 48, pages 5504 - 5508,
    - T.W. GREENE; P.G. M. WUTS, Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis" 3rd ed.,, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1999),
    - E. W. MARTIN,, Remington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, 19th edition,, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1995),
    - MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry,
    - C. MCGUIGAN ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RES., (1992), vol. 17, pages 311 - 321,
    - D. CURLEY ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RES., (1990), vol. 14, pages 345 - 356,
    - MCGUIGAN ET AL., ANTIVIRAL CHEM. CHEMOTHER, vol. 19901, no. 2, pages 107 - 113,
    - CLARK, J. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 48, pages 5504 - 5508,