Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2274664

EP2274664 - A METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT, AND SYSTEM FOR PREVENTING INADVERTENT CONFIGURATION OF ELECTRONIC DEVICES PROVIDED WITH INFRARED DATA ASSOCIATION INTERFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  29.04.2016
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 01.06.2016  [2016/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micro Motion, Inc.
7070 Winchester Circle
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
[2011/03]
Inventor(s)01 / SOBEL, Michael Ezra
10370 North Newcombe Street
Westminster Colorado 80021 / US
02 / DIGRAZIA, Xiaoling
1710 Turin Drive
Longmont Colorado 80503 / US
 [2011/03]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
P.O. Box 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/42]Hartwell, Ian Peter , et al
Olilia Law Limited
First Floor, Unit 5, The Courtyard
Wixford Park
Bidford on Avon
Warwickshire B50 4JS / GB
Former [2011/19]Holmes, Matthew William , et al
Ollila Law Limited First Floor Unit 5 The Courtyard Wixford Park Bidford on Avon
Warwickshire B50 4JS / GB
Former [2011/03]Lanoe, Benjamin
Ollila Lanoe LLP The Coach House Wootton Park Farm
Wootton Wawen, Warwickshire B95 6HJ / GB
Application number, filing date08733047.801.04.2008
[2011/03]
WO2008US59007
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009123620
Date:08.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2274664
Date:19.01.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009
[2011/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/023
[2011/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT UND SYSTEM ZUM VERHINDERN EINER UNBEABSICHTIGTEN KONFIGURATION VON ELEKTRONISCHEN EINRICHTUNGEN, DIE MIT INFRAROT-DATENASSOZIATIONSSCHNITTSTELLEN AUSGESTATTET SIND[2011/03]
English:A METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT, AND SYSTEM FOR PREVENTING INADVERTENT CONFIGURATION OF ELECTRONIC DEVICES PROVIDED WITH INFRARED DATA ASSOCIATION INTERFACES[2011/03]
French:PROCÉDÉ, ENSEMBLE DE PROGRAMMES INFORMATIQUES, ET SYSTÈME DE PRÉVENTION DE CONFIGURATION PAR INADVERTANCE DE DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES POURVUS D'INTERFACES INFRAROUGES D'ASSOCIATION DE DONNÉES[2011/03]
Entry into regional phase01.11.2010National basic fee paid 
01.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
01.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/03]
23.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2012Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/22]
21.12.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
09.03.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/22]
Appeal following examination21.02.2013Appeal received No.  T1073/13
25.04.2013Statement of grounds filed
09.03.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
09.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.03.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.02.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0499497  (ALCATEL SATMAM [FR]) [X] 1-22 * page 6, line 52 - page 9, line 25; figures 3-11 *;
 [X]GB2359401  (CARRIER GRAHAM [GB]) [X] 1-22 * page 5, lines 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0057446  (TOKYO OPTICAL [JP]) [A] 5,12,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO8504295  (NP NEW PROD NORDINVENT INVEST [SE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *