Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2274664 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2274664



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 246
26.04.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.04.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 15
14.04.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.03.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 9
15.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
09.02.2016 Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation Appeal 1
08.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
08.02.2016 Claims Appeal 3
08.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
29.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.01.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
11.01.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.12.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
11.12.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
08.12.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
18.07.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.05.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.05.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
25.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.04.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
21.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.02.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
03.01.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
21.12.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
21.12.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.12.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
21.12.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
21.12.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
21.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
13.09.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.09.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
06.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.09.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.08.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
23.08.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
23.08.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.08.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.08.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.08.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.08.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.08.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 General authorisation Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.06.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.06.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.06.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
25.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.08.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
25.08.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
25.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.08.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
24.06.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.06.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.06.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.04.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.04.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 10
24.02.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.02.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.12.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
23.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.11.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
19.11.2010 Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
01.11.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
01.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.11.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
01.11.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
01.11.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
19.10.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
13.08.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.03.2010 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
08.10.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.10.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21
02.12.2008 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
02.12.2008 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
02.12.2008 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
02.05.2008 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
02.05.2008 Claims International Searching Authority 4
02.05.2008 Description International Searching Authority 11
02.05.2008 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 3
02.05.2008 Drawings International Searching Authority 5