blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2099234

EP2099234 - METHOD AND SYSTEM AND DEVICE FOR REGISTERING PROCESS . [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / WU, Wenfu
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2012/45]
Former [2009/37]01 / WU, Wenfu
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
Representative(s)Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH
Riesstraße 25
80992 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/21]Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3
80992 München / DE
Former [2010/24]Sachseder, Matthias, et al
Huawei Technologies European Research Center Riesstraße 25
D-80992 München / DE
Former [2009/37]Charles, Glyndwr, et al
Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date08734264.808.05.2008
[2009/37]
WO2008CN70909
Priority number, dateCN20071010440011.05.2007         Original published format: CN200710104400
CN20071018175824.10.2007         Original published format: CN200710181758
CN20071016554002.11.2007         Original published format: CN200710165540
CN2008108572913.03.2008         Original published format: CN200810085729
[2009/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2008138259
Date:20.11.2008
Language:ZH
[2008/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2099234
Date:09.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2099234
Date:07.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN20.11.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2010
ClassificationIPC:H04W8/02
[2010/12]
CPC:
H04W60/04 (EP,US); H04L63/0892 (EP,US); H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W36/1443 (EP); H04W8/04 (EP,US); H04W36/14 (US)
Former IPC [2009/39]H04W4/00
Former IPC [2009/37]H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM UND GERÄT FÜR REGISTRIERUNGSVERFAHREN[2009/37]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM AND DEVICE FOR REGISTERING PROCESS .[2009/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF POUR UN PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT[2009/37]
Entry into regional phase23.07.2009Translation filed 
23.07.2009National basic fee paid 
23.07.2009Search fee paid 
23.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/37]
26.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2012Fee for grant paid
25.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10167471.1  / EP2227055
EP11176895.8  / EP2398279
EP15155200.7  / EP2897429
EP17190745.4  / EP3294017
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.05.2010
Opposition(s)08.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
MT07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
TR07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
GB08.05.2013
IE08.05.2013
LU08.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
MT07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
TR07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
GB08.05.2013
IE08.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2015/13]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
MT07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
GB08.05.2013
IE08.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/24]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
GB08.05.2013
IE08.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/21]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
GB08.05.2013
IE08.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/20]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
IE08.05.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/08]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
CH31.05.2013
LI31.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/37]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/28]BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/27]BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
Former [2013/26]CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
Former [2013/24]CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
Former [2013/23]CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
NL07.11.2012
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
Former [2013/20]LT07.11.2012
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2004100403  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 2-5,13,15,17 * page 22, line 14 - line 16 * * page 23, line 22 - page 24, line 14 * * page 25, line 5 - line 12 * * page 26, line 26 - line 34 * * page 28, line 23 - line 28 * * claim 22 * * figures 7A,7B *;
 [XY]WO2007011638  (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,12,14,16 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 3A,3C,6,9A,9C * [Y] 2-5,13,15,17;
 [E]WO2008094419  (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [E] 1,12,14,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 2A,2C,2D *;
 [X]  - INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES, "GPRS attach type while in DTM", 3GPP DRAFT; N1-050367_DTM_ATT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20050221), vol. CN WG1, no. Sydney, Australia; 20050221, XP050072059 [X] 1,12,14,16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - CATT, "TAU procedure", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-071772, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070418), vol. SA WG2, no. Beijing; 20070418, XP050259531 [A] 3-4 * page 1, paragraph 5.3.3 - page 4, paragraph 5.3.3.1 * * figures 5.3.3-1 *
 [A]  - HUAWEI, "refine attach procedure", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-071691, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070418), vol. SA WG2, no. Beijing; 20070418, XP050259458 [A] 1,3-4,12,14,16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HUAWEI, "Handover from non 3GPP to 3GPP", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-071701 INTER 3GPP_NON3GPP HANDOVER_PROCEDURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070418), vol. SA WG2, no. Beijing; 20070418, XP050259467 [A] 5-6 * the whole document *
 [A]  - INTEL, "Handover from 3GPP Access (UTRAN) to non-3GPP Access (TS 23.402)", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-071907_HANDOVER_3GPP_2_NON-3GPP_V5, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070419), vol. SA WG2, no. Beijing; 20070419, XP050259645 [A] 5-6 * the whole document *
 [T]  - HUAWEI, "Attach Type in attach procedure", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-072558, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070619), vol. SA WG2, no. Orlando; 20070619, XP050260149 [T] 1-6,12-17 * the whole document *
International search[A]CN1275872  (NEC CORP [JP]);
 [X]CN1605222  (NOKIA CORP [FI]);
 [A]CN1882160  (ZTE CORP [CN])
by applicantWO2004100403
 WO2007011638
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.