Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2164656

EP2164656 - THE METHOD OF SYNTHESIS OF THE IRON NANOPOWDER WITH THE PROTECTIVE OXIDIC COAT FROM NATURAL AND SYNTHETIC NANOPOWDERED IRON OXIDES AND OXIHYDROXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2014
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita palackeho V Olomouci
Krizkovskeho 8
71744 Olomouc / CZ
[2010/12]
Inventor(s)01 / ZBORIL, Radek
J. Misaka 22
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
02 / SCHNEEWEISS, Oldrich
Ukrajinská 1
625 00 Brno / CZ
03 / FILIP, Jan
U zahradek 450/1
78301 Olomouc / CZ
04 / MASLAN, Miroslav
Rataje 40
78346 Tesetice / CZ
 [2010/12]
Representative(s)Kendereski, Dusan
Koliste 13a
602 00 Brno / CZ
[N/P]
Former [2013/30]Kendereski, Dusan
Lidicka 51
602 00 Brno / CZ
Former [2010/12]Kendereski, Dusan
Lidicka 51
602 00 Brno / CZ
Application number, filing date08734299.403.04.2008
[2010/12]
WO2008CZ00040
Priority number, dateCZ2007000025512.04.2007         Original published format: CZ 20070255
[2010/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008125068
Date:23.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2164656
Date:24.03.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008
[2010/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2164656
Date:24.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Search report(s)International search reportEP11.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:B22F1/00, B22F1/02, B22F9/30, B09C1/00, C02F1/00
[2010/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/12]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE EINES EISENNANOPULVERS MIT EINER OXIDISCHEN SCHUTZSCHICHT AUS NATÜRLICHEN UND SYNTHETISCHEN NANOPULVER-EISENOXIDEN UND OXIHYDROXIDEN[2010/12]
English:THE METHOD OF SYNTHESIS OF THE IRON NANOPOWDER WITH THE PROTECTIVE OXIDIC COAT FROM NATURAL AND SYNTHETIC NANOPOWDERED IRON OXIDES AND OXIHYDROXIDES[2010/12]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE DE NANOPOUDRE DE FER AVEC UN ENROBAGE D'OXYDE PROTECTEUR PROVENANT D'OXYDES ET D'OXYHYDROXYDES DE FER NANOPULVÉRULENTS NATURELS ET SYNTHÉTIQUES[2010/12]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2009National basic fee paid 
30.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/12]
16.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
18.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2013Fee for grant paid
05.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2010
Opposition(s)25.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27]
Request for further processing for:22.01.2010Request for further processing filed
22.01.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.02.2010Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
22.01.2010Request for further processing filed
22.01.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.02.2010Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
22.01.2010Request for further processing filed
22.01.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.02.2010Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
22.01.2010Request for further processing filed
22.01.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.02.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
11.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.04.2008
AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
TR24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
IE03.04.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU03.04.2008
AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
IE03.04.2014
Former [2016/25]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
IE03.04.2014
Former [2016/16]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MT24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
IE03.04.2014
Former [2015/21]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
IE03.04.2014
Former [2014/24]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
ES24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/21]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/14]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
NL24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
CY21.08.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/12]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
CY21.08.2013
NO24.10.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/11]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
CY21.08.2013
NO24.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/10]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
CY21.08.2013
NO24.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT24.07.2013
BE24.07.2013
HR24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT24.07.2013
NO24.10.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/07]NO24.10.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006113255  (KAKUYA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * claim 8 *;
 [A]WO2004001019  (UNIV MONTANA STATE [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 30, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]EP0232246  (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BRIDGER K ET AL, "MAGNETIC CHARACTERISTICS OF ULTRAFINE FE PARTICLES REDUCED FROM UNIFORM IRON OXIDE PARTICLES", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19870415), vol. 61, no. 8, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 3323 - 3325, XP008072271 [A] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.338895
Examination   - 'NANOVED 2006 - NENAMAT Programme', [Online] May 2006, International Conferences Advances in Nanostructured Materials, Processing - Microstructure-Properties Retrieved from the Internet: [retrieved on 2010-11-30]
by applicantUS2006113255