Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2176819

EP2176819 - METHOD OF EFFECTING PAYMENT TRANSACTION USING A MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.07.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Direct Pay, S.R.O.
Vinohradska 138
130 00 Praha 3 / CZ
[2010/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CECHL, Martin
Dittrichova 3
120 00 Praha 2 / CZ
 [2010/16]
Representative(s)Beder, Jens , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2014/25]
Former [2014/13]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2010/16]Korejzová, Petra
Korejzová & Co. Law and Patent Offices Korunní 104/E
101 00 Praha 10 / CZ
Application number, filing date08734302.614.04.2008
[2010/16]
WO2008CZ00043
Priority number, dateCZ2007000050426.07.2007         Original published format: CZ 20070504
[2010/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009012731
Date:29.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2176819
Date:21.04.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009
[2010/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/00
[2010/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BEWIRKEN EINER ZAHLUNGSTRANSAKTION UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES MOBILEN ENDGERÄTS[2010/16]
English:METHOD OF EFFECTING PAYMENT TRANSACTION USING A MOBILE TERMINAL[2010/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR EFFECTUER UNE TRANSACTION DE PAIEMENT À L'AIDE D'UN TERMINAL MOBILE[2010/16]
Entry into regional phase24.02.2010National basic fee paid 
24.02.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
11.05.2010Examination requested  [2012/47]
05.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2014Date of oral proceedings
08.09.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.09.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination24.11.2014Appeal received No.  T0273/15
02.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.03.2013
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
11.05.2010Request for further processing filed
11.05.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.06.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
08.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
29.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
29.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
20.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201811   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0219211  (MICROCREDITCARD COM INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7, line 16 - page 19, line 6 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2003018567  (FLITCROFT DANIEL IAN [IE], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0058] - [0074] * * figure - *;
 [X]US2004054624  (GUAN QI [AT], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0025] - [0027] * * figure - *;
 [A]US2001056409  (BELLOVIN STEVEN MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] * * figure - *;
 [A]EP1081919  (GEBIT GES FUER EDV BERATUNG UN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO2007055675  (KOMISSARUK MYKHAILO [UA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [A]FR2837952  (MESTRALLET MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 8, line 19 - page 9, line 15 *
by applicantCZ295057
 US2001025271