Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2142646

EP2142646 - METHOD OF INCREASING OF THE PHOTOSYNTHETIC CARBON DIOXIDE ASSIMILATION YIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.09.2015
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 29.11.2017  [2017/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ústav Organické Chemie Biochemie Akademie Ved Ceské Republiky, V.V.I.
Flemingovo námesti 2
166 10 Praha 6 / CZ
[N/P]
Former [2010/02]For all designated states
Ustav Organicke Chemie A Biochemie Akademie Ved Ceske Republiky
Flemingovo nam. 2
166 10 Praha 6 / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / MACEK, Tomás
Krizíkova 93
186 00 Praha 8 / CZ
02 / UHLÍK, Ondrej
Na Vysluní 255
251 66 Mirosovice / CZ
03 / KAMLAR, Marek
Jestrebí 144
789 01 Zábreh / CZ
04 / HARMATHA, Juraj
Koulova 11
160 00 Praha 6 / CZ
05 / KOHOUT, Ladislav
Bazovského 1228/8
163 00 Praha 6 / CZ
 [2014/30]
Former [2010/02]01 / MACEK, Thomás
Krizíkova 93
186 00 Praha 8 / CZ
02 / UHLÍK, Ondrej
Na Vysluní 255
251 66 Mirosovice / CZ
03 / KAMLAR, Marek
Jestrebí 144
789 01 Zábreh / CZ
04 / HARMATHA, Juraj
Koulova 11
160 00 Praha 6 / CZ
05 / KOHOUT, Ladislav
Bazovského 1228/8
163 00 Praha 6 / CZ
Representative(s)Herman, Vaclav
Hlavni 43
252 43 Pruhonice / CZ
[2014/47]
Former [2010/02]Herman, Vaclav
Hlavni 43
252 43 Pruhonice / CZ
Application number, filing date08734303.414.04.2008
[2010/02]
WO2008CZ00044
Priority number, dateCZ2007000027517.04.2007         Original published format: CZ 20070275
[2010/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008125069
Date:23.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2142646
Date:13.01.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008
[2010/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2142646
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search reportEP05.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/88, C07J73/00
[2010/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER PHOTOSYNTHETISCHEN KOHLENDIOXID-ASSIMILIERUNGSAUSBEUTE[2010/02]
English:METHOD OF INCREASING OF THE PHOTOSYNTHETIC CARBON DIOXIDE ASSIMILATION YIELD[2010/02]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'AUGMENTATION DU RENDEMENT D'ASSIMILATION DU DIOXYDE DE CARBONE PHOTOSYNTHÉTIQUE[2010/02]
Entry into regional phase21.10.2009National basic fee paid 
21.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.2009Examination requested  [2010/02]
25.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2014Fee for grant paid
06.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.06.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.05.2010
Opposition(s)20.08.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.04.2008
AT19.11.2014
BE19.11.2014
BG19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
MT19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
TR19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
IE14.04.2015
LU14.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
[2017/46]
Former [2017/39]HU14.04.2008
AT19.11.2014
BG19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
MT19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
TR19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
IE14.04.2015
LU14.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2017/03]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
MT19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
IE14.04.2015
LU14.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/20]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
IE14.04.2015
LU14.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/12]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SI19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
LU14.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
FR30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/06]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
LU14.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/03]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
IT19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
LU14.04.2015
Former [2016/01]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
MC19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
LU14.04.2015
Former [2015/52]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
LU14.04.2015
Former [2015/37]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
SK19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/36]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
CZ19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
RO19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/35]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
EE19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/34]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
DK19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/26]AT19.11.2014
CY19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/25]AT19.11.2014
ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/24]ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
HR19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
LV19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
PL19.11.2014
SE19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
GR20.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/23]ES19.11.2014
FI19.11.2014
LT19.11.2014
NL19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
IS19.03.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/22]LT19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
PT19.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT19.11.2014
NO19.02.2015
Former [2015/20]LT19.11.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]  - YU JING QUAN ET AL, "A role for brassinosteroids in the regulation of photosynthesis in Cucumis sativus", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, (200405), vol. 55, no. 399, ISSN 0022-0957, pages 1135 - 1143, XP002505991 [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 5; figures 1,2,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/JXB/ERH124
 [A]  - MACHACKOVA VVANA MARTIN VAGNER ET AL, "Comparison between the effects of 20-hydroxyecdysone and phytohormones on growth and development in plants", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ENTOMOLOGY, (1995), vol. 92, no. 1, ISSN 1210-5759, pages 309 - 316, XP002506032 [A] * the whole document *
 [A]  - S. ÇA?, N. GÖREN-SA?LAM, Ç. ÇINGIL-BARI? AND E. KAPLAN, "THE EFFECT OF DIFFERENT CONCENTRATION OF EPIBRASSINOLIDE ON CHLOROPHYLL, PROTEIN AND ANTHOCYANIN CONTENT AND PEROXIDASE ACTIVITY IN EXCISED RED CABBAGE (BRASSICA OLERACEAE L.) COTYLEDONS", BIOTECHNOLOGY & BIOTECHNOLOGICAL EQUIPMENT, (2007), vol. 24, no. 4, XP002506033 [A] * page 424; figure 1 *
 [PX]  - O.UHLIK ET AL., "Affinity chromatography reveals RuBisCo as an ecdysteroid-binding protein", STEROIDS, (2008), vol. 73, pages 1433 - 1440, XP002505992 [PX] 1-3,5,9,10 * page 1436, column 2 - page 1437, column 1; figure 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.STEROIDS.2008.07.009
by applicant   - JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, (200405), vol. 55, no. 399, pages 1135 - 1143,