Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2139791 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2139791



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1149
11.02.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.02.2021 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
09.02.2021 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.02.2021 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 17
05.02.2021 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
05.02.2021 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
26.11.2020 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.11.2020 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.11.2020 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
19.11.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
19.11.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
19.11.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.11.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.11.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.11.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
12.11.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
12.11.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.11.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.11.2020 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
23.06.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.06.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.06.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.06.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.06.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.06.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.06.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.06.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.06.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.06.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.06.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.05.2020 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
29.05.2020 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
29.05.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.05.2020 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
25.05.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
25.05.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
25.05.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
25.05.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
25.05.2020 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
13.01.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
13.01.2020 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
13.01.2020 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 9
19.11.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.11.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.11.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
11.11.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
06.11.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.11.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
04.11.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.2019 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 7
16.10.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Appeal 1
24.06.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.06.2019 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Appeal 2
11.06.2019 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
11.06.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2019 Request for transfer of rights - opponent Appeal 11
17.05.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
24.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
14.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
09.03.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
22.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.08.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 14
22.07.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
19.05.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.05.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 87
21.03.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
21.03.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
16.03.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
14.03.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
21.01.2016 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 1
20.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.01.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
15.01.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
15.01.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 4
15.01.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 9
15.01.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 12
08.12.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 10
02.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.11.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.11.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
06.11.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
06.11.2015 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.11.2015 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
08.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.03.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.03.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.03.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.03.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.03.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.03.2015 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
18.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.03.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.03.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
12.03.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.03.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.03.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
30.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
22.01.2015 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
21.01.2015 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
21.01.2015 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
20.01.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
14.03.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
28.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
26.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
21.02.2014 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 15
17.02.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
20.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.11.2013 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 2
20.11.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
19.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2013 Authorisation Opposition 1
12.11.2013 Authorisation Opposition 1
12.11.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
12.11.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
17.09.2013 Invitation to file an authorisation Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.05.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.04.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.03.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 19
26.03.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
26.03.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 43
26.03.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 93
26.03.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 35
26.03.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
26.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
26.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
26.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
26.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
26.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
26.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
21.09.2012 Correction to published European patent application/patent specification Search / examination 1
03.09.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.08.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
25.07.2012 General authorisation Search / examination 1
25.07.2012 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
20.07.2012 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
18.07.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
18.07.2012 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
20.06.2012 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 4
20.06.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.06.2012 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 1
20.06.2012 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 1
11.06.2012 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
11.06.2012 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
11.06.2012 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 1
01.06.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.03.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.03.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
26.03.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
23.03.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.03.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
23.03.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
22.12.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
22.12.2011 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
22.12.2011 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
16.12.2011 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
12.12.2011 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
12.12.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 44
12.12.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 20
12.12.2011 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 8
02.12.2011 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
23.11.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.11.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
23.11.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.11.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
07.07.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
07.07.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
07.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.07.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
05.07.2011 Description Search / examination 2
05.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.03.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.02.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Lawyer) Search / examination 1
23.12.2009 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
09.12.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.12.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
08.12.2009 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 1
30.11.2009 Authorisation Search / examination 1
24.11.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
12.10.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
12.10.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.10.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
09.10.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
09.10.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.10.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
27.08.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.11.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
23.10.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
23.10.2008 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 21
09.04.2008 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
09.04.2008 Claims PCT receiving Office 5
09.04.2008 Description PCT receiving Office 12
09.04.2008 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3
09.04.2008 Submission concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1