Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2150607

EP2150607 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CULTURING AND/OR TRANSPORTING CELLULAR STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.04.2012  [2012/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robio Systems Ltd
33 Grand Union Centre, West Row
London W10 5AS / GB
[2010/06]
Inventor(s)01 / DODGSON, John, R
Robio Systems Ltd 33 Grand Union Centre West Row
London W10 5AS / GB
02 / AUSTEN, Malcolm, T
Robio Systems Ltd 33 Grand Union Centre West Row
London W10 5AS / GB
03 / MILLER, Bryan, J., A.
Robio Systems Ltd 33 Grand Union Centre West Row
London W10 5AS / GB
04 / CATTINI, Raymond, A
Robio Systems Ltd 33 Grand Union Centre West Row
London W10 5AS / GB
 [2010/06]
Representative(s)Sharp, Alan Cooper
Cooper Sharp & Co 32 Spencer Street St Albans
Hertfordshire AL3 5EG / GB
[2010/06]
Application number, filing date08737083.923.04.2008
[2010/06]
WO2008GB01427
Priority number, dateGB2007000777623.04.2007         Original published format: GB 0707776
[2010/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008129300
Date:30.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2150607
Date:10.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008
[2010/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/00, C12M3/00, A61D19/02
[2010/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/06]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KULTIVIERUNG UND/ODER ZUM TRANSPORT ZELLULÄRER STRUKTUREN[2010/06]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CULTURING AND/OR TRANSPORTING CELLULAR STRUCTURES[2010/06]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN CULTURE ET/OU DE TRANSPORT DE STRUCTURES CELLULAIRES[2010/06]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2009National basic fee paid 
23.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/06]
07.01.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.11.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/17]
07.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/17]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.06.2010
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
21.02.2011Request for further processing filed
21.02.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.03.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DX]US2006228794  (RANOUX CLAUDE [US] ET AL) [DX] 1-26 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0062] * * figures 1,2,9,10 *;
 [A]FR2650256  (MARCOUX JEAN [CA]) [A] * page 6 - page 9; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO2006097751  (ROBIO SYSTEMS LTD [GB]; DODGSON JOHN ROBERT [GB]; FORTT ROBIN [GB]; AU) [A] * claim 1 * * paragraph [0088] * * figure 3c *