Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2109841

EP2109841 - A SECURITY MODULE HAVING A SECONDARY AGENT IN COORDINATION WITH A HOST AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Absolute Software Corporation
Suite 1600, Four Bentall Centre 1055 Dunsmuir Street P.O. Box 49211
Vancouver, BC V7X 1K8 / CA
[2017/38]
Former [2009/43]For all designated states
Absolute Software Corporation
Suite 1600, Four Bentall Centre 1055 Dunsmuir Street P.O. Box 49211
Vancouver, BC V7X 1K8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / GORDON, William, Doyle
9-1465 West 14th Avenue
Vancouver, B.C. V6H 1R4 / CA
 [2009/43]
Representative(s)Walker, Stephen , et al
Lincoln IP
9 Victoria Street
Aberdeen
Aberdeenshire AB10 1XB / GB
[2017/38]
Former [2012/02]Walker, Stephen , et al
Lincoln IP 9 Victoria Street Aberdeen
Aberdeenshire AB10 1XB / GB
Former [2009/48]Peter, Kenneth William
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2009/43]Peter, Kenneth William
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date08737355.115.01.2008
[2009/43]
WO2008IB00753
Priority number, dateUS20070880800P16.01.2007         Original published format: US 880800 P
[2009/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008090470
Date:31.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2109841
Date:21.10.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008
[2009/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2109841
Date:20.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA21.04.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/57, G06F21/81, G06F21/88, G08B13/14, H04L29/06, H04W12/12, H04W4/02
[2017/27]
Former International [2012/07]H04L29/10, G06F21/00
Former International [2011/23]H04L29/10
Former International [2009/43]G06F21/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/38]
Former [2009/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSMODUL MIT SEKUNDÄRAGENT IN KOORDINATION MIT EINEM HOST-AGENTEN[2009/43]
English:A SECURITY MODULE HAVING A SECONDARY AGENT IN COORDINATION WITH A HOST AGENT[2009/43]
French:MODULE DE SÉCURITÉ DOTÉ D'UN AGENT SECONDAIRE EN COORDINATION AVEC UN AGENT HÔTE[2009/43]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2009National basic fee paid 
19.06.2009Search fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.2011Examination requested  [2011/48]
07.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.06.2017
08.06.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
12.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2017Fee for grant paid
10.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2013
Opposition(s)21.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
18.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IE15.01.2018
LU15.01.2018
IS20.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IE15.01.2018
LU15.01.2018
IS20.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
LU15.01.2018
IS20.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
LU15.01.2018
IS20.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
LU15.01.2018
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/23]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/10]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[XDI]US2006272020  (GARDNER PHILIP B [US]) [XD] 1,15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0170] * * paragraph [0201] * * paragraph [0219] * [I] 2-14;
 [I]US5748084  (ISIKOFF JEREMY M [US]) [I] 1-15 * column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * column 3, paragraph 6; figures 3,4 *;
 [I]  - Intel, "Built-in Manageability and Improved Security for Desktop PCs", (20061231), URL: http://inside.cybernet.ch/redaktion/vPro_Whitepaper.pdf, (20111221), XP055015304 [I] 1-15 * page 3 - page 4 * * page 11 - page 13 *
 [A]  - INTEL CORPORATION, "Intel Active Management Technology Setup and Configuration Service - Installation and User Manual", INTERNET CITATION, (20061130), pages 1 - 120, URL: http://cache-www.intel.com/cd/00/00/32/09/320963_320963.pdf, (20110411), XP002632520 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2006272020  (GARDNER PHILIP B [US])
by applicantUS4818998
 US5748084
 US6362736
 US6636175
 US6950946
 US2003117316
 US2006123307
 US5715174
 US5764892
 US5802280
 US6244758
 US6269392
 US6300863
 US6507914
 US2006272020
 US2005216757
 WO2006102399
 US2007234427
 WO2007109366
    - PRODUCT BRIEF EDGE/GPRS/GSM SINGLE-CHIP MULTIMEDIA BASEBAND PROCESSOR, URL: http://www.broadcom.com/collateral/pb/2133-PB07-R.pdf
    - ARCHITECTURE GUIDE: INTEL ACTIVE MANAGEMENT TECHNOLOGY, (20070919), URL: http://softwarecommunity.intel.com/articles/eng/1032.htm