Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2148766

EP2148766 - RAZOR CARTRIDGE WITH FRONT PIVOT AXIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.10.2016
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2017New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
[2016/49]
Former [2012/23]For all designated states
The Gillette Company
One Gillette Park- 3E
Boston, MA 02127 / US
Former [2010/05]For all designated states
The Gillette Company
Prudential Tower Building
Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US
Inventor(s)01 / O'CONNOR, William, Thomas
18 Gordon Drive
Londonderry, New Hampshire 03053 / US
02 / PRUDDEN, John, Jr.
43 Belcher Street
Essex, Massachusetts 01929 / US
03 / TUCKER, William, Earle
9 Powers Lane
Attleboro, Massachusetts 02703 / US
 [2010/05]
Representative(s)Chandrani, Vandita , et al
Procter & Gamble Company Patents London Innovation Centre Whitehall Lane Egham
Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
[2010/05]
Application number, filing date08737920.218.04.2008
[2010/05]
WO2008IB51511
Priority number, dateUS2007078853820.04.2007         Original published format: US 788538
[2010/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008129498
Date:30.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2148766
Date:03.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008
[2010/05]
Search report(s)International search reportEP30.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/22
[2010/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/05]
TitleGerman:RASIERKLINGENEINHEIT MIT VORDERDREHACHSE[2010/05]
English:RAZOR CARTRIDGE WITH FRONT PIVOT AXIS[2010/05]
French:CARTOUCHE DE RASOIR POURVUE D'UN AXE DE PIVOTEMENT AVANT[2010/05]
Entry into regional phase05.10.2009National basic fee paid 
05.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.10.2009Examination requested  [2010/05]
12.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2011
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
09.02.2012Request for further processing filed
09.02.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.02.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
08.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005172494  (AVIZA GREGORY D [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0071]; figures 1-16 *;
 [A]US5533263  (GILDER BERNARD [GB]) [A] 4,5 * column 1, line 53 - line 59; figures 1-5 *;
 [PX]WO2007094337  (KAI R&D CENTER CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1 * abstract *