Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2147325

EP2147325 - METHOD AND RF TRANSMITTER ARRANGEMENT FOR GENERATING RF FIELDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.05.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
[2013/39]
Former [2010/04]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GRAESSLIN, Ingmar
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / BOERNERT, Peter
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / VERNICKEL, Peter
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / KATSCHER, Ulrich
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2010/04]
Representative(s)van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2010/04]Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date08737988.924.04.2008
[2010/04]
WO2008IB51590
Priority number, dateEP2007010753904.05.2007         Original published format: EP 07107539
[2010/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008135883
Date:13.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2147325
Date:27.01.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008
[2010/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/34, G01R33/3415, G01R33/561
[2010/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND HF-SENDERANORDNUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON HF-FELDERN[2010/04]
English:METHOD AND RF TRANSMITTER ARRANGEMENT FOR GENERATING RF FIELDS[2010/04]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉMETTEUR RADIOFRÉQUENCE POUR GÉNÉRER DES CHAMPS RADIOFRÉQUENCE[2010/04]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2009National basic fee paid 
04.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/04]
26.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination04.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0533/15
13.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.03.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]US6900636  (LEUSSLER CHRISTOPH GUENTHER [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 34 * * column 7, line 23 - line 32 * * column 8, line 8 - line 32 *;
 [X]US2005099178  (KING SCOTT [CA], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054] *;
 [X]US6650118  (LEUSSLER CHRISTOPH GUENTHER [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 5, line 66 - column 7, line 10 *;
 [X]WO2005124380  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 4, line 9 - line 27 * * page 9, line 22 - line 26; figures 3A,3B,4 *;
 [X]US4682112  (BEER STEVE [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * column 3, line 44 - line 57; figure 1 *;
 [X]  - WRIGHT S M ET AL, "Theory and application of array coils in MR spectroscopy", NMR IN BIOMEDICINE, WILEY, LONDON, GB, (19970101), vol. 10, no. 8, ISSN 0952-3480, pages 394 - 410, XP009016838 [X] 1-9 * page 395, column L; figure 11 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-1492(199712)10:8<394::AID-NBM494>3.0.CO;2-0
 [X]  - WEIHUA MAO ET AL, "Exploring the limits of RF shimming for high-field MRI of the human head", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE WILEY USA, (200610), vol. 56, no. 4, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 918 - 922, XP002495546 [X] 1,6-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.21013
 [X]  - PINKERTON R G ET AL, "Transceive surface coil array for magnetic resonance imaging of the human brain at 4 T", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE WILEY USA, (200508), vol. 54, no. 2, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 499 - 503, XP002495547 [X] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.20583
 [PX]  - VERNICKEL P ET AL, "Eight-channel transmit/receive body MRI coil at 3 T", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE JOHN WILEY & SONS INC. USA, (200708), vol. 58, no. 2, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 381 - 389, XP002495548 [PX] 1-9 * page 387, column R, paragraph 4 - page 388, column R, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.21294
 [A]  - ADRIANY GREGOR ET AL, "Transmit and receive transmission line arrays for 7 Tesla parallel imaging.", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE / SOCIETY OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE FEB 2005, (200502), vol. 53, no. 2, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 434 - 445, XP002495549 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.20321
 [A]  - VERNICKEL P. ET AL, "An EightChannel Transmit/Receive Body Coil for 3T", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ISMRM 14TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING, Seattle, Washington, USA, (20060506), page 123, XP002495550 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2005099178
 US6900636
    - IBRAHIM ET AL., "Effect of RF coil excitation on field inhomogeneity at ultra high fields: a field optimized TEM resonator", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING, (200112), vol. 19, no. 10, pages 1339 - 47