Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2147094 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2526
17.07.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
17.07.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
17.07.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
07.07.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
07.07.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
07.07.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
03.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.07.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.07.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.05.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.05.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
09.05.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 15
09.05.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
09.05.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.05.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
09.05.2017 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 65
09.05.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
03.05.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
03.05.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.05.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 2
03.05.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.05.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2017 Amended description with annotations Opposition 7
23.03.2017 Description Opposition 6
23.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.03.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 24
08.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2017 Claims Opposition 24
08.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
08.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
07.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 39
16.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
16.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
16.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 21
16.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
16.01.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
12.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
12.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.07.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.07.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
26.07.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
26.07.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
03.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
24.02.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Claims Opposition 1
24.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
24.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
24.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
24.02.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 133
24.02.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 63
24.02.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 38
11.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
22.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 6
22.12.2015 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 4
22.12.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
02.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2015 Rectification of designation of inventor (Legal Division) Opposition 1
21.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Opposition 1
14.08.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.08.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.08.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.07.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
07.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
07.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
07.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
07.07.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
07.07.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
07.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
07.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
07.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 55
07.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 224
07.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 254
07.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 66
07.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 69
07.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 106
08.04.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.10.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
08.10.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
08.10.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
08.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
08.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
08.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
08.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
08.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
08.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
08.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
08.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
08.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.10.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.09.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.09.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.09.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
01.09.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
01.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.06.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 92
27.06.2014 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 92
27.06.2014 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 3
13.06.2014 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
06.06.2014 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 2
06.06.2014 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
07.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.11.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
07.11.2013 Description Search / examination 4
07.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.11.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.07.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.07.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.02.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.02.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
27.02.2013 Description Search / examination 4
27.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.02.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
29.10.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.10.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.10.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.10.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
11.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
11.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
11.02.2011 Description Search / examination 1
11.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.02.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.12.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.12.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.08.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.08.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.02.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
05.02.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
05.02.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
05.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.01.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
05.01.2010 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
30.12.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.11.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.11.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
18.11.2009 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 14
18.11.2009 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
18.11.2009 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 16
18.11.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
18.11.2009 Sequence listing Search / examination 3
03.09.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.11.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
30.10.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
30.10.2008 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 96
30.10.2008 Sequence listing Search / examination 3
28.05.2008 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.05.2008 Claims International Searching Authority 4
28.05.2008 Description International Searching Authority 50
28.05.2008 Drawings International Searching Authority 41