Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2157688

EP2157688 - MOTOR DRIVING DEVICE, MOTOR DEVICE, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.06.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.07.2016  [2016/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2010/08]
Inventor(s)01 / YASOHARA, Masahiro
c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / SUGIURA, Kenji
c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2010/08]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/08]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date08738471.503.04.2008
[2010/08]
WO2008JP00859
Priority number, dateJP2007015722114.06.2007         Original published format: JP 2007157221
[2010/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008152761
Date:18.12.2008
Language:JA
[2008/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2157688
Date:24.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/08]
Search report(s)International search reportJP18.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:H02P6/12, H02P27/06
[2010/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/08]
TitleGerman:MOTORANTRIEBSEINRICHTUNG, MOTOREINRICHTUNG UND INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNGSEINRICHTUNG[2010/08]
English:MOTOR DRIVING DEVICE, MOTOR DEVICE, AND INTEGRATED CIRCUIT DEVICE[2010/08]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE MOTEUR, DISPOSITIF DE MOTEUR, ET DISPOSITIF DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ[2010/08]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2009Translation filed 
10.12.2009National basic fee paid 
10.12.2009Search fee paid 
10.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/08]
25.05.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2004282838  (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]JP2007137311  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [A]JPH06245565  (TOSHIBA CORP)