Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2138467

EP2138467 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GLASS PLATE AND GLASS PLATE PRODUCING EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.12.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
27.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Electric Glass Co., Ltd.
7-1 Seiran 2-chome Otsu-shi
Shiga 520-8639 / JP
[2010/01]
Inventor(s)01 / KIN, Shusei
c/o NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO. LTD.
7-1 Seiran 2-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8639 / JP
02 / ODA, Hidetaka
c/o NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO. LTD.
7-1 Seiran 2-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8639 / JP
03 / TOMAMOTO, Masahiro
c/o NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO. LTD.
7-1 Seiran 2-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8639 / JP
 [2013/09]
Former [2010/01]01 / KIN, Shusei
c/o NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO. LTD. 7-1 Seiran 2-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8639 / JP
02 / ODA, Hidetaka
c/o NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO. LTD. 7-1 Seiran 2-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8639 / JP
03 / TOMAMOTO, Masahiro
c/o NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO. LTD. 7-1 Seiran 2-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8639 / JP
Representative(s)Tetzner, Michael , et al
Tetzner & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Van-Gogh-Strasse 3
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/01]Tetzner, Michael , et al
Van-Gogh-Strasse 3
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date08739654.502.04.2008
[2010/01]
WO2008JP56543
Priority number, dateJP2007011431124.04.2007         Original published format: JP 2007114311
[2010/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008132939
Date:06.11.2008
Language:JA
[2008/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2138467
Date:30.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2138467
Date:27.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.11.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:C03B17/06, G02F1/1333
[2010/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GLASPLATTE UND AUSRÜSTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GLASPLATTE[2010/01]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GLASS PLATE AND GLASS PLATE PRODUCING EQUIPMENT[2010/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PLAQUES DE VERRE ET APPAREILLAGE DE PRODUCTION DE PLAQUES DE VERRE[2010/01]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2009Translation filed 
14.10.2009National basic fee paid 
14.10.2009Search fee paid 
14.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/53]
22.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2013Fee for grant paid
16.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.11.2013   
Schott AG
Hattenbergstrasse 10
55122 Mainz / DE
Opponent's representative
Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang
Dreiköniggasse 10
89073 Ulm / DE
 [2014/01]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
10.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition27.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0256/17
30.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
17.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.04.2008
AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
IT27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
MT27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
TR27.02.2013
IE02.04.2013
LU02.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
BG27.05.2013
GB27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
IT27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
MT27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
TR27.02.2013
IE02.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
BG27.05.2013
GB27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2015/13]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
IT27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
MT27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
IE02.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
BG27.05.2013
GB27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2014/21]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
IT27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
IE02.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
BG27.05.2013
GB27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2014/20]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
IT27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
IE02.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2014/11]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
IT27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2014/08]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
IT27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2014/03]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
IT27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2014/01]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/52]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/49]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/48]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
DK27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/41]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/40]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/38]AT27.02.2013
BE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
Former [2013/37]AT27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
Former [2013/36]AT27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
PL27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
ES07.06.2013
IS27.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT27.02.2013
SE27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
NO27.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT27.02.2013
NO27.05.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]DE10040640  (SCHOTT GLAS [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0009] , [0023] - paragraphs [0025] , [0032] , [0037]; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1721872  (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0050]; figure 1 *
International search[A]US2006236722  (DELIA ROBERT [US], et al);
 [A]JP2002137930  (CORNING INC);
 [A]JPH0691235  (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO)
by applicantJPH1053426
 JP2001031435