Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2121989

EP2121989 - K-RAS MUTATIONS AND ANTI-EGFR ANTIBODY THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.12.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amgen Inc.
One Amgen Center Drive
Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US
[2009/48]
Inventor(s)01 / FREEMAN, Daniel
942 Grayrock Street
Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US
02 / JUAN, Todd
4629 Calle San Juan
Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US
03 / RADINSKY, Robert
3574 Lang Ranch Parkway
Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US
 [2013/36]
Former [2009/48]01 / FREEMAN, Daniel
942 Grayrock Street
Newbury Park, California 91320 / US
02 / JUAN, Todd
4629 Calle San Juan
Newbury Park, California 91320 / US
03 / RADINSKY, Robert
3574 Lang Ranch Parkway
Thousand Oaks, California 91362 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/04]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2009/48]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date08742061.811.03.2008
[2009/48]
WO2008US03312
Priority number, dateUS20070906943P13.03.2007         Original published format: US 906943 P
[2009/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008112269
Date:18.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2121989
Date:25.11.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008
[2009/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2121989
Date:22.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, G01N33/574
[2013/35]
Former International [2009/48]C12Q1/68
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/48]
Extension statesAL11.09.2009
BA11.09.2009
MK11.09.2009
RS11.09.2009
TitleGerman:K-RAS-MUTATIONEN UND ANTI-EGFR-ANTIKÖRPERTHERAPIE[2009/48]
English:K-RAS MUTATIONS AND ANTI-EGFR ANTIBODY THERAPY[2009/48]
French:MUTATIONS DE KRAS ET TRAITEMENT AVEC DES ANTICORPS ANTI-EGFR[2009/48]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2009National basic fee paid 
11.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/48]
27.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2013Fee for grant paid
10.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12154109.8  / EP2465950
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.10.2014  24.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Desaix, Anne, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75009 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2019/17]
Opponent(s)01  21.10.2014  24.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Desaix, Anne, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2016/44]
Opponent(s)01  21.10.2014  24.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe
Witney, Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
Desaix, Anne, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SAS
3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2014/48]
Opponent(s)01  21.10.2014   
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Desaix, Anne, et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SAS
3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
28.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.11.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition20.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0208/17
05.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
20.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0208/17
04.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007001868  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - EBERHARD D A ET AL, "Mutations in the epidermal growth factor receptor and in KRAS are predictive and prognostic indicators in patients with non-small-cell lung cancer treated with chemotherapy alone and in combination with erlotinib", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (20040901), vol. 23, no. 25, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 5900 - 5909, XP002400936 [X] 1,2,6-8,12 * the whole document * * tables 2,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2005.02.857
 [X]  - PAO W ET AL, "KRAS mutations and primary resistance of lung adenocarcinomas to gefitinib or erlotinib", PLOS MEDICINE 2005 US, (2005), vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 1549-1277 1549-1676, pages 0057 - 0061, XP002400935 [X] 1,2,6-8,12 * the whole document * * tables 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pmed.0020017
 [X]  - LIÈVRE ASTRID ET AL, "KRAS mutation status is predictive of response to cetuximab therapy in colorectal cancer.", CANCER RESEARCH 15 APR 2006, (20060415), vol. 66, no. 8, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3992 - 3995, XP002400937 [X] 1-3,6-9,12 * the whole document * * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-0191
 [PX]  - BENVENUTI SILVIA ET AL, "Oncogenic activation of the RAS/RAF signaling pathway impairs the response of metastatic colorectal cancers to anti-epidermal growth factor receptor antibody therapies", 20070315, (20070315), XP002491315 [PX] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-4158
 [PX]  - AMADO RAFAEL G ET AL, "Wild-type KRAS is required for panitumumab efficacy in patients with metastatic colorectal cancer", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (20080401), vol. 26, no. 10, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 1626 - 1634, XP009104317 [PX] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2007.14.7116
 [A]  - FRIDAY ET AL, "K-ras as a target for cancer therapy", BBA - REVIEWS ON CANCER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20051125), vol. 1756, no. 2, ISSN 0304-419X, pages 127 - 144, XP005204727 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbcan.2005.08.001
 [A]  - CARAGLIA MICHELE ET AL, "EGF-R small inhibitors and anti-EGF-R antibodies: advantages and limits of a new avenue in anticancer therapy.", RECENT PATENTS ON ANTI-CANCER DRUG DISCOVERY JUN 2006, (200606), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 1574-8928, pages 209 - 222, XP009104857 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/157489206777442250
 [A]  - CHUA YU JO ET AL, "Panitumumab", DRUGS OF TODAY, (200611), vol. 42, no. 11, ISSN 1699-3993, pages 711 - 719, XP002493245 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dot.2006.42.11.1032061
Examination   - M C Garassino ET AL, "Effect of tumor-specific KRAS mutational status on impact of anti-EGFR therapy in non-small cell lung cancer (NSCLC)", J. Clin. Oncol. 28: 15s (suppl; abstr. 7564), (20100101), XP055052539

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/jco.2010.28.15_suppl.7564
    - KIRK REBECCA, "Genetics: In colorectal cancer, not all KRAS mutations are created equal.", NATURE REVIEWS. CLINICAL ONCOLOGY JAN 2011, (201101), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 1759-4782, page 1, XP009166871

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrclinonc.2010.204
by applicantWO9824893
 WO9850433
 US6235883
 US2004033543
 US5151510
 US5500362
 US5821337
 US5470705
 US5514543
 US5580732
 US5624800
 US5807682
 US6759202
 US6756204
 US6734296
 US6395486
 US2003190646
 WO2007001868
 US2005272083
    - ULLRICH ET AL., CELL, (1990), vol. 61, pages 203 - 212
    - BASELGA ET AL., PHARMACOL. THER., (1994), vol. 64, pages 127 - 154
    - MENDELSOHN ET AL., Biologic Therapy of Cancer, J.B. LIPPINCOTT CO., (1995), pages 607 - 623
    - FAN ET AL., CURR. OPIN. ONCOL., (1998), vol. 10, pages 67 - 73
    - MENDELSOHN, CANCER CELLS, (1989), vol. 7, page 359
    - MENDELSOHN, CANCER BIOLOGY, (1990), vol. 1, pages 339 - 344
    - MODJTAHEDI; DEAN, INN J. ONCOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, pages 277 - 296
    - MODJTAHEDI; DEAN, INT'I J. ONCOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, pages 277 - 296
    - MODJTAHEDI ET AL., INTL. J. OF ONCOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, pages 277 - 296
    - GULLICK, BR. MEDICAL BULLETIN, (1991), vol. 47, pages 87 - 98
    - SALOMON ET AL., CRIT. REV. ONCOL. HEMATOL., (1995), vol. 19, pages 183 - 232
    - TOSI ET AL., INN J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 62, pages 643 - 650
    - MODJTAHEDI ET AL., INTL. J. ONCOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, pages 277 - 296
    - ABOUD-PIRAK ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1988), vol. 80, pages 1605 - 1611
    - MODJTAJEDI ET AL., INTI. J. ONCOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, pages 277 - 296
    - MODJTAHEDI ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1993), vol. 67, pages 247 - 253
    - MODJTAHEDI ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1993), vol. 67, pages 254 - 261
    - FAN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 4637 - 4642
    - BASELGA ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1993), vol. 85, pages 1327 - 1333
    - GOLDSTEIN ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 1, pages 1311 - 1318
    - PREWETT ET AL., J. IMMUNOTHER. EMPHASIS TUMOR IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 19, pages 419 - 427
    - MODJTAHEDI ET AL., INTI. J. OF ONCOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, pages 277 - 296
    - MENDEZ, NATURE GENETICS, (1997), vol. 15, pages 146 - 156
    - JAKOBOVITS, ADV. DRUG DELIV. REV., (1998), vol. 31, no. 1-2, pages 33 - 42
    - JAKOBOVITS, EXPERT OPIN. INVEST. DRUGS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 607 - 614
    - YANG ET AL., CRIT. REV. ONCOL. HEMATOL., (2001), vol. 38, no. 1, pages 17 - 23
    - YANG ET AL., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, no. 6, pages 1236 - 43
    - YAO, R., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, pages 2003 - 2006
    - LAPLANCHE ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, page 9081
    - STEC ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1984), vol. 106, page 6077
    - STEIN ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, page 3209
    - ZON ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (1991), vol. 6, page 539
    - ZON ET AL., Oligonucleotides and Analogues: A Practical Approach, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1991), pages 87 - 108
    - UHLMANN; PEYMAN, CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (1990), vol. 90, page 543
    - DAYHOFF, M.O., Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, NATIONAL BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, (1972), vol. 5, pages 101 - 110
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL, (1970), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (U.S.A.), (1988), vol. 85, page 2444
    - THORNTON, NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, page 105
    - FAUCHERE, J. ADV. DRUG RES., (1986), vol. 15, page 29
    - VEBER; FREIDINGER, TINS, (1985), page 392
    - EVANS ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1987), vol. 30, page 1229
    - RIZO; GIERASCH, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 61, page 387
    - BOWIE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 253, page 164
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 186, page 651
    - NOVOTNY; HABER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1985), vol. 82, page 4592
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 877 - 883
    - PLUCKTHUN, IMMUNOL. REV., (1992), vol. 130, pages 151 - 188
    - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL, (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - RAVETCH; KINET, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL, (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 92
    - CLYNES ET AL., PNAS (USA), (1988), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656
    - THERASSE ET AL., "New Guidelines to Evaluate the Response to Treatment in Solid Tumors", J. NATL. CANCER INST., (200002), vol. 92, no. 3, pages 205 - 216
    - SCHIMANSKI ET AL., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, pages 5169 - 5175
    - NAGASAKA ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2004), vol. 22, pages 4584 - 4596
    - LIEVRE ET AL., CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 66, pages 3992 - 3994