blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2134870 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2134870



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1686
20.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Claims Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Claims Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Claims Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Claims Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.08.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 32
03.04.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
23.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
23.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
23.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
23.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.03.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.03.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.03.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
05.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2018 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
26.01.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
22.01.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.01.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.01.2018 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
19.01.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.12.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
21.11.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
21.11.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 21
21.11.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.11.2017 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
11.10.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
25.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.08.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
17.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
17.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
17.08.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
10.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
10.08.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.08.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
27.06.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
22.06.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
10.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.12.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.12.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.12.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
15.12.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.12.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.12.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.12.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.05.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
03.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.05.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 26
01.04.2016 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
31.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.03.2016 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.11.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
09.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.11.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
04.08.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.08.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
13.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
11.12.2014 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
11.12.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.12.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Authorisation of representative Opposition 9
25.11.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.11.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.11.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
25.11.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
25.11.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
25.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.02.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
30.01.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.01.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.01.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
11.01.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
11.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.09.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.09.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.09.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.09.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 162
06.04.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 57
06.04.2013 Description Search / examination 64
06.04.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.02.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
25.02.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.12.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.12.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
19.12.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 29
19.12.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.08.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
23.08.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
08.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
08.05.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
07.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
07.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
07.05.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
27.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.12.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.06.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
16.06.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
29.04.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.04.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.04.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.12.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
03.07.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
01.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
01.07.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
07.05.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.04.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.03.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
08.03.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
22.12.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.12.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.12.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
08.12.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
08.12.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
25.11.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.11.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
15.10.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
01.10.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 195
21.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.09.2009 Annex Search / examination 1
21.09.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
13.08.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
29.10.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 167
09.10.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
09.10.2008 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 94
09.10.2008 Sequence listing Search / examination 92
18.04.2008 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
18.04.2008 Claims International Searching Authority 4
18.04.2008 Description International Searching Authority 85
18.04.2008 Drawings International Searching Authority 3
18.04.2008 Sequence listing International Searching Authority 93