blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2134870


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.03.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
23.01.2018 Change: Appeal number
22.01.2018 New entry: Appeal number
22.01.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
20.11.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.11.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
23.06.2017 Change - representative
26.12.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
04.05.2016 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.03.2016 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
25.11.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
03.08.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
27.03.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
28.01.2015 Change - representative
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
09.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2015  [2015/07]
05.12.2014 Opposition filed published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
21.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
12.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
22.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
24.01.2014 (Expected) grant published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
22.01.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.01.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.09.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.09.2013 Change - inventor published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
20.09.2013 Change - priority published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
20.09.2013 Change - German title published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
20.09.2013 Change - English title published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
20.09.2013 Change - French title published on  23.10.2013  [2013/43]
13.09.2013 Change - classification published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
13.09.2013 Change - classification published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
13.09.2013 Change - German title published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
13.09.2013 Change - English title published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
13.09.2013 Change - French title published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
10.04.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.04.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.12.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.08.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.05.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.12.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.06.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.04.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.04.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.12.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.07.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.06.2010 Change - extension states published on  07.07.2010  [2010/27]
03.05.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.03.2010 Change - representative published on  14.04.2010  [2010/15]
18.12.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.12.2009 First examination report
11.12.2009 Amendment by applicant
20.11.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.12.2009  [2009/52]
20.11.2009 Request for examination filed published on  23.12.2009  [2009/52]
30.10.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
17.10.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
22.09.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
22.10.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
11.10.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.2008 PCT data prior to European publication