blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2134870
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8847006Global Dossier 30.09.2014B2
US2008256660 16.10.2008A1
Priority number Date
US7817308 27.03.2008
US92053107 28.03.2007
US104907 31.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2682177Global Dossier 21.11.2017C
CA2682177 09.10.2008A1
Priority number Date
WO2008US03973 27.03.2008
US92053107 28.03.2007
US104907 31.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2134870Global Dossier 26.02.2014B1
EP2134870 23.12.2009A1
Priority number Date
WO2008US03973 27.03.2008
US92053107 28.03.2007
US104907 31.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR106817 21.02.2018A2
Priority number Date
US92053107 28.03.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0810083 05.06.2018B1
BRPI0810083 05.05.2015A2
Priority number Date
WO2008US03973 27.03.2008
US92053107 28.03.2007
US104907 31.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101680035B 31.05.2017B
CN101680035 24.03.2010A
Priority number Date
WO2008US03973 27.03.2008
US92053107 28.03.2007
US104907 31.10.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA200906351 28.07.2010B
Priority number Date
US92053107 28.03.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2008121291Global Dossier 09.10.2008A1
Priority number Date
US92053107 28.03.2007
US104907 31.10.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR066203 05.08.2009A1
Priority number Date
US92053107 28.03.2007
US104907 31.10.2007