Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2147450

EP2147450 - COLOR TEMPERATURE TUNABLE WHITE LIGHT SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intematix Corporation
46410 S. Fremont Blvd.
Fremont CA 94538 / US
[2010/04]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Yi-Qun
30 Trish Lane
Danville, California 94506 / US
02 / DONG, Yi
1765 Hoops Court
Tracy, California 95376 / US
03 / XU, Xiaofeng
38856 Northern Common
Fremont, Arizona 94536 / US
 [2010/04]
Representative(s)Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark , et al
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/45]Birdi, Sandeep Singh , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2010/04]Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M.
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date08742671.409.04.2008
[2010/04]
WO2008US04567
Priority number, dateUS2007078710713.04.2007         Original published format: US 787107
[2010/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008127593
Date:23.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2147450
Date:27.01.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008
[2010/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/08
[2011/25]
Former International [2010/04]H01J1/62
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/04]
TitleGerman:WEISSLICHTQUELLE MIT ABSTIMMBARER FARBTEMPERATUR[2010/04]
English:COLOR TEMPERATURE TUNABLE WHITE LIGHT SOURCE[2010/04]
French:SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE BLANCHE POUVANT ÊTRE ACCORDÉE AVEC LA TEMPÉRATURE DE COULEUR[2010/04]
Entry into regional phase12.11.2009National basic fee paid 
12.11.2009Search fee paid 
12.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/04]
20.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.03.2015
17.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/32]
17.03.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
27.03.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.05.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6504179  (ELLENS ANDRIES [NL] ET AL) [X] 1,7-9,14 * column 1, lines 9-18; figures 3, 8 * * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 40 * * column 5, lines 14-27 * * column 6, lines 5-17 * * claims 1, 8-10 * [Y] 2-6,10-13,15;
 [Y]US6692136  (MARSHALL THOMAS M [US] ET AL) [Y] 2,4,15 * column 1, lines 11-17; figures 2, 3, 7 * * column 3, lines 3-67 * * column 4, lines 43-53 *;
 [Y]US2006114201  (CHANG CHIN [US]) [Y] 3-6,10,12,13 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 6, 10 * * page 2, paragraph 29 - page 3, paragraph 36 *;
 [Y]US6760515  (WANG TING [US] ET AL) [Y] 11 * column 1, lines 13-22 * * column 1, lines 48-57 *;
 [XI]US2006239006  (CHAVES JULIO C [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,7,8,14,15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 8; figures 75, 77-80 * * page 2, paragraphs 13, 17 * * page 9, paragraph 200 * * page 13, paragraph 248 - page 14, paragraph 249 * * page 14, paragraph 259 - page 15, paragraph 266 * * page 19, paragraph 309 * * page 21, paragraph 324 * * page 32, paragraph 438 - page 33, paragraph 439 * * page 34, paragraph 446 * * page 34, paragraph 449 - page 36, paragraph 460 * [I] 10;
 [X]US2007080364  (HSIUNG BEAR [TW]) [X] 1,3,4,7,14 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 24 * * page 2, paragraph 31 - page 3, paragraph 41 *
International search[X]US6504179  ;
 [Y]US6692136  ;
 [Y]US2006114201  ;
 [Y]US6760515
by applicantUS7014336
 US6504179
 US6692136
 US2006114201
 US6760515
 US2006239006
 US2007080364