Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2188712 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 968
02.04.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 2
20.03.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
20.03.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 2
19.03.2015 Communication about missing advice of delivery Appeal 3
06.03.2015 Communication about missing advice of delivery Appeal 3
21.01.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 14
21.01.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
18.12.2014 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.12.2014 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
01.12.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.12.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.12.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
28.11.2014 Communication about missing advice of delivery Appeal 3
14.11.2014 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
11.11.2014 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
05.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.11.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
23.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.10.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.10.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
14.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.10.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.10.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
26.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Annex Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
26.09.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.09.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.09.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 14
26.09.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.09.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 14
26.09.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
26.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Miscellaneous requests for changes concerning the applicant Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Request for re-establishment of rights Appeal 2
26.09.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
13.08.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.08.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 3
05.08.2014 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
31.07.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.06.2014 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
19.05.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
12.05.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.05.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
11.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
11.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
11.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
11.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
11.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
11.04.2014 Amended description with annotations Appeal 10
11.04.2014 Amended description with annotations Appeal 10
11.04.2014 Amended description with annotations Appeal 9
11.04.2014 Amended description with annotations Appeal 9
11.04.2014 Claims Appeal 5
11.04.2014 Claims Appeal 5
11.04.2014 Claims Appeal 5
11.04.2014 Claims Appeal 5
11.04.2014 Description Appeal 12
11.04.2014 Description Appeal 9
11.04.2014 Description Appeal 11
11.04.2014 Description Appeal 9
11.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.04.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 2
11.04.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
31.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
31.01.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.12.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
04.12.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 14
04.12.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 2
04.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.11.2013 General enquiry Search / examination 1
11.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.08.2013 General enquiry Search / examination 1
21.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.06.2013 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
31.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.05.2013 General enquiry Search / examination 1
31.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.11.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
19.11.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
19.11.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
19.11.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
19.11.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Description Search / examination 7
19.11.2012 Description Search / examination 7
19.11.2012 Description Search / examination 7
19.11.2012 Description Search / examination 7
19.11.2012 Description Search / examination 7
19.11.2012 Description Search / examination 7
19.11.2012 Description Search / examination 7
19.11.2012 Description Search / examination 7
19.11.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
19.11.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.11.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
19.11.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.10.2012 Annex Search / examination 3
23.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.10.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.10.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
19.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
19.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
19.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
19.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
19.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
19.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
19.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 6
03.09.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.08.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
23.08.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.08.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.04.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
20.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.03.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 6
20.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.03.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
08.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.03.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.11.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.11.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.08.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.08.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
18.08.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 16
18.08.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
18.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.07.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.07.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
25.07.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
15.02.2011 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
28.01.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.01.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 3
28.01.2011 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
31.08.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.08.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.08.2010 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
21.05.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.05.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.04.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.04.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.04.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.2010 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
15.04.2010 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
13.04.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
25.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.03.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.03.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
23.03.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
23.03.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
23.03.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
12.03.2010 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
11.02.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 4
17.12.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
16.12.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.12.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.12.2009 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
04.12.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.12.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.12.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.10.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
26.03.2009 Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data Search / examination 2
26.02.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
26.02.2009 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
04.02.2009 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
21.01.2009 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
18.12.2008 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 107
18.12.2008 Priority document Search / examination 97
18.12.2008 Priority document Search / examination 81
18.12.2008 Priority document Search / examination 81