blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2149104 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2149104



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 348
30.11.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.11.2016 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.11.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
21.11.2016 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
11.10.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
14.01.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
14.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 11
14.01.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
14.01.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
14.01.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
28.07.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
09.07.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.07.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
09.07.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
18.05.2015 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 2
18.03.2015 Invitation to indicate the claims to be searched Search / examination 2
13.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
10.06.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
22.01.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
07.01.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.12.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
17.11.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.11.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
17.11.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
03.09.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
18.11.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 139
30.10.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
30.10.2008 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 129