blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2149104


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.11.2016 Withdrawal of application published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
30.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
10.07.2015 Change - classification published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
10.07.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
11.04.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.06.2010 Change - extension states published on  28.07.2010  [2010/30]
23.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.01.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.02.2010  [2010/05]
01.01.2010 Request for examination filed published on  03.02.2010  [2010/05]
15.12.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
24.11.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
24.11.2009 Amendment by applicant
15.11.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
01.11.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.2008 PCT data prior to European publication