blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2149104 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP06789543 EP06789544 EP06800931 EP08745968 EP08861432 EP10163457 EP10164057 EP10187101



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2009079371Global Dossier 25.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
US1385907 14.12.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2007019483Global Dossier 15.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2007019472Global Dossier 06.01.2011A8
WO2007019472 15.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2007019471Global Dossier 15.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2009229888Global Dossier 17.09.2009A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
US46945209 20.05.2009
US46289806 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8606552Global Dossier 10.12.2013B2
US2013043077 21.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US85726810 16.08.2010
US73843105 21.11.2005
US201213656527 19.10.2012
US46289806 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8352221Global Dossier 08.01.2013B2
US2011077928 31.03.2011A1
Priority number Date
US46292906 07.08.2006
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
US93815110 02.11.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8296115Global Dossier 23.10.2012B2
US2010300758 02.12.2010A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US85726810 16.08.2010
US73843105 21.11.2005
US46289806 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8145465Global Dossier 27.03.2012B2
US2011015911 20.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
US46291806 07.08.2006
US70632105 08.08.2005
US89252310 28.09.2010
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
US1385907 14.12.2007
US33382408 12.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7860696Global Dossier 28.12.2010B2
US2009090556 09.04.2009A1
Priority number Date
US46291806 07.08.2006
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
US1385907 14.12.2007
US33382408 12.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7860693Global Dossier 28.12.2010B2
US2007192074 16.08.2007A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US73706507 18.04.2007
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
US46289806 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7827014Global Dossier 02.11.2010B2
US2007032958 08.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
US46292906 07.08.2006
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7778777Global Dossier 17.08.2010B2
US2007029111 08.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
US46289806 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7729895Global Dossier 01.06.2010B2
US2007029113 08.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
US46291806 07.08.2006
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2281996Global Dossier 09.02.2011A2
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
EP06800931 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2264275Global Dossier 22.12.2010A2
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
EP06789544 08.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2258918Global Dossier 08.12.2010A2
Priority number Date
US46945209 20.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2240881Global Dossier 30.09.2015A4
EP2240881 20.10.2010A1
Priority number Date
US1385907 14.12.2007
WO2008US86586 12.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1931858Global Dossier 18.06.2008A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
WO2006US30804 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1931854Global Dossier 18.06.2008A1
Priority number Date
WO2006US30830 07.08.2006
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1929117Global Dossier 11.06.2008A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
WO2006US30803 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2907330Global Dossier 17.01.2017C
CA2907330 30.10.2008A1
Priority number Date
US73706507 18.04.2007
CA2684276 16.04.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2706343Global Dossier 23.08.2016C
CA2706343 25.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
US1385907 14.12.2007
WO2008US86586 12.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2684276Global Dossier 04.10.2016C
CA2684276 30.10.2008A1
Priority number Date
US73706507 18.04.2007
WO2008US60468 16.04.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2625012Global Dossier 03.05.2016C
CA2625012 15.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
WO2006US30804 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2625009Global Dossier 20.12.2016C
CA2625009 15.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
WO2006US30830 07.08.2006
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2149104Global Dossier 12.08.2015A4
EP2149104 03.02.2010A1
Priority number Date
US73706507 18.04.2007
WO2008US60468 16.04.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2008338627B 10.04.2014B2
AU2008338627 25.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
US1385907 14.12.2007
WO2008US86586 12.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0810441 14.10.2014A2
Priority number Date
US73706507 18.04.2007
WO2008US60468 16.04.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0821259 16.06.2015A2
Priority number Date
US1385907 14.12.2007
WO2008US86586 12.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2624106 09.07.2013C
CA2624106 15.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
WO2006US30803 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2704718 20.11.2010A1
Priority number Date
US46945209 20.05.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2921128 15.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
CA2625012 08.08.2006
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE112006002134T 26.06.2008T5
Priority number Date
WO2006US30830 07.08.2006
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE112006002135T 31.07.2008T5
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
WO2006US30804 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE112006002137T 26.06.2008T5
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
WO2006US30803 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2443125 08.02.2012B
GB2443125 23.04.2008A
GB0802299D 12.03.2008D0
Priority number Date
WO2006US30830 07.08.2006
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2443126 28.03.2012B
GB2443126 23.04.2008A
GB0802300D 12.03.2008D0
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
WO2006US30803 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2443127 14.12.2011B
GB2443127 23.04.2008A
GB0802302D 12.03.2008D0
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
WO2006US30804 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2482850 28.03.2012B
GB2482850 15.02.2012A
GB201121670D 25.01.2012D0
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2482851 04.04.2012B
GB2482851 15.02.2012A
GB201121671D 25.01.2012D0
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2483022 04.04.2012B
GB2483022 22.02.2012A
GB201120833D 11.01.2012D0
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2009011178 11.12.2009A
Priority number Date
US73706507 18.04.2007
WO2008US60468 16.04.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2010006477 04.10.2010A
Priority number Date
US1385907 14.12.2007
WO2008US86586 12.12.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO20081184L 05.05.2008L
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
WO2006US30803 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO20081185L 05.05.2008L
Priority number Date
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
WO2006US30804 07.08.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO20081187L 05.05.2008L
Priority number Date
WO2006US30830 07.08.2006
US70632105 08.08.2005
US70632305 08.08.2005
US73845305 21.11.2005
US73843105 21.11.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2008130997Global Dossier 30.10.2008A1
Priority number Date
US73706507 18.04.2007