Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2149104

EP2149104 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR DESIGNING AND/OR SELECTING DRILLING EQUIPMENT USING PREDICTIONS OF ROTARY DRILL BIT WALK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.12.2016  [2016/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Boulevard
Houston, TX 77072-5299 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/05]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Boulevard
Houston, TX 77072-5299 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Shilin
34 West Prairie Dawn Circle
The Woodlands, Texas 77385 / US
 [2010/05]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/05]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
D-81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date08745968.116.04.2008
[2010/05]
WO2008US60468
Priority number, dateUS2007073706518.04.2007         Original published format: US 737065
[2010/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008130997
Date:30.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2149104
Date:03.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008
[2010/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06G7/50
[2010/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM KONZIPIEREN UND/ODER WÄHLEN VON BOHREINRICHTUNGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VORHERSAGEN FÜR DREHBOHRMEISSELABWEICHUNG[2010/05]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR DESIGNING AND/OR SELECTING DRILLING EQUIPMENT USING PREDICTIONS OF ROTARY DRILL BIT WALK[2010/05]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR CONCEVOIR ET/OU SÉLECTIONNER UN ÉQUIPEMENT DE FORAGE AU MOYEN DE PRÉDICTIONS D'UNE AVANCÉE DE TRÉPAN ROTATIF[2010/05]
Entry into regional phase17.11.2009National basic fee paid 
17.11.2009Search fee paid 
17.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/05]
14.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
08.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007029111  (CHEN SHILIN [US]) [X] 1-8,15,16 * paragraphs [0139] , [ 185] , [ 206] , [ 218] , [ 349] , [ 350] * * page 22, line 2, paragraph 352 * * claims 1,2,3,7,8,9,10,11,15 * * figures 9-10 *;
 [L]  - S Chen ET AL, "IADC/SPE 112641 Reexamination of PDC Bit Walk in Directional and Horizontal Wells", (20080306), URL: https://www.onepetro.org/download/conference-paper/SPE-112641-MS?id=conference-paper/SPE-112641-MS, (20150703), XP055199926 [L] 1,5
International search[X]US2007029111  ;
 [A]US2007029113  ;
 [A]US2007032958  ;
 [A]US2007011895  ;
 [A]US5794720  ;
 [A]US6438495
by applicantUS2007029111