EP2174215 - RESTRUCTURING DATA FROM A TRACE BUFFER OF A CONFIGURABLE IC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altera Corporation 101 Innovation Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1941 / US | [2015/37] |
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states Tabula (Assignment for the Benefit of Creditors), LLC 3250 Olcott Street Santa Clara CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Tabula, Inc. 3250 Olcott St. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTCHINGS, Brad 3682 N 230 E Provo, UT 84604 / US | 02 /
TEIG, Steven 935 College Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
CALDWELL, Andrew 4217 Rivermark Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Hermann, Felix, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Hermann, Felix, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/06] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters Sherborne House 119-121 Cannon Street London EC4N 5AT / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08746482.2 | 21.04.2008 | [2010/15] | WO2008US61072 | Priority number, date | US20070769683 | 27.06.2007 Original published format: US 769683 | US20070769680 | 27.06.2007 Original published format: US 769680 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009002600 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2174215 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2174215 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/38, // H03K19/177, H03K19/00, G06F17/50 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
H03K19/17752 (EP);
G06F30/34 (EP);
H03K19/17736 (EP);
H03K19/17756 (EP);
H03K19/17764 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/15] | G06F7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2010/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | UMSTRUKTURIERUNG VON DATEN AUS EINEM TRACE-PUFFER EINES KONFIGURIERBAREN IC | [2010/15] | English: | RESTRUCTURING DATA FROM A TRACE BUFFER OF A CONFIGURABLE IC | [2010/15] | French: | RESTRUCTURATION DE DONNÉES À PARTIR D'UNE MÉMOIRE TAMPON DE TRACE D'UN CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ CONFIGURABLE | [2010/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2008 | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | GB | 21.04.2017 | IE | 21.04.2017 | LU | 21.04.2017 | MT | 21.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | FR | 02.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.04.2008 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 21.04.2017 | ||
MT | 21.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.04.2008 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 21.04.2017 | ||
MT | 21.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 21.04.2017 | ||
MT | 21.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 21.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 21.04.2017 | ||
LU | 21.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006176075 (OR-BACH ZVI [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0022] - [0616] * [I] 2-13; | [I]US2001033188 (AUNG EDWARD [US], et al) [I] 4-8 * paragraphs [0083] - [0088] *; | [A]US2007007999 (GRAHAM DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2006176075 (OR-BACH ZVI [US]); | [Y]US2001033188 (AUNG EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]US2007007999 (GRAHAM DAVID W [US], et al) | by applicant | US2006176075 | US2001033188 |