Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2147098

EP2147098 - USE OF PROTEIN HYDROLYSATES TO STABILIZE METALLOPROTEASE DETERGENT FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.06.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Danisco US Inc.
925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[2010/06]
Former [2010/04]For all designated states
Danisco US, Inc., Genencor Division
925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Sang-Kyu
Danisco US Inc., Genencor Division
925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
02 / WINETZKY, Deborah, S.
Danisco US Inc., Genencor Division
925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
 [2013/29]
Former [2010/04]01 / LEE, Sang-Kyu
Danisco US Inc., Genencor Division 925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
02 / WINETZKY, Deborah, S.
Danisco US Inc., Genencor Division 925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/29]Forrest, Graham Robert , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2010/04]Forrest, Graham Robert , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date08746618.123.04.2008
[2010/04]
WO2008US61230
Priority number, dateUS20070914965P30.04.2007         Original published format: US 914965 P
[2010/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008134343
Date:06.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2147098
Date:27.01.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008
[2010/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2147098
Date:17.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/96, C11D3/38, C11D3/386, C12P21/06, C12N9/54
[2010/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/04]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON PROTEINHYDROLYSATEN ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON METALLOPROTEASE-DETERGENS-FORMULIERUNGEN[2010/04]
English:USE OF PROTEIN HYDROLYSATES TO STABILIZE METALLOPROTEASE DETERGENT FORMULATIONS[2010/04]
French:UTILISATION D'HYDROLYSATS DE PROTÉINE POUR STABILISER DES FORMULATIONS DÉTERSIVES DE MÉTALLOPROTÉASE[2010/04]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2009National basic fee paid 
18.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/04]
01.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2013Fee for grant paid
06.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.03.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.04.2014  10.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2015/42]
Opponent(s)01  07.04.2014  10.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2014/20]
Opponent(s)01  07.04.2014  10.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Stevens, Ian Edward
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
26.05.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition17.06.2015Statement of grounds filed
13.04.2016Appeal received
12.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.11.2010Request for further processing filed
17.11.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.11.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.04.2008
AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
TR17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
FI23.04.2016
[2017/10]
Former [2016/33]HU23.04.2008
AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
TR17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2016/32]HU23.04.2008
AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2016/25]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
BG17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2016/16]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/21]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
IE23.04.2014
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/08]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
LU23.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/01]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
LU23.04.2014
Former [2014/52]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/24]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
IT17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
CZ17.07.2013
EE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
SK17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
RO17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
CY17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/14]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
NL17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CY14.08.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/12]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
LV17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
SI17.07.2013
CY14.08.2013
NO17.10.2013
GR18.10.2013
ES28.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/11]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
PL17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
CY14.08.2013
NO17.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/10]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
CY14.08.2013
NO17.10.2013
IS17.11.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT17.07.2013
BE17.07.2013
HR17.07.2013
LT17.07.2013
SE17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT17.07.2013
NO17.10.2013
PT18.11.2013
Former [2014/07]NO17.10.2013
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2007044993  (GENENCOR INT [US], et al) [X] 16-18,23-25 * the whole document * * page 150, line 22 - page 151, line 2; figure 29 * * page 24, line 26 - line 28 * [Y] 1-15,21,22,26-30;
 [A]EP0544359  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] * abstract * * page 7, line 48 - line 58 *;
 [A]US3325364  (JAY MERRITT A, et al) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]US3296094  (THEODORE CAYLE) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1359157  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] * abstract * * paragraph [0022] *;
 [A]US5039446  (ESTELL DAVID A [US]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [XY]  - KAMMOUN R ET AL, "Protein size distribution and inhibitory effect of wheat hydrolysates on Neutrase(R).", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (200312), vol. 90, no. 3, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 249 - 254, XP002491648 [X] 16-20,23,24 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15,21,22,26-30

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-8524(03)00130-5
 [A]  - MUNEKIYO S M ET AL, "Presence of peptide inhibitors in rattlesnake venoms and their effects on endogenous metalloproteases", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, (20050301), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0041-0101, pages 255 - 263, XP004742410 [A] * abstract * * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2004.10.009
by applicantEP0130756
 USRE34606E
 EP0214435
 WO8704461
 WO8705050
 EP0260105
 WO8808028
 WO8808033
 WO9527049
 WO9530011
 WO9530010
 WO9529979
 US5543302
 EP0251446
 WO8906279
 WO9100345
 EP0525610
    - MOLECULAR & CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 51