blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2031883

EP2031883 - METHOD, SYSTEM, NETWORK DEVICE, AND MOBILE DATA SERVICE MANAGEMENT PLATFORM FOR DOWN SENDING CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.10.2012
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2012Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.11.2012  [2012/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2009/10]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / PENG, Jin
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / YANG, Jialong
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2009/10]
Representative(s)Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Karlstraße 7
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/10]Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date08748640.321.05.2008
[2009/10]
WO2008CN71034
Priority number, dateCN20071011070008.06.2007         Original published format: CN200710110700
[2009/10]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2008151535
Date:18.12.2008
Language:ZH
[2008/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2031883
Date:04.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN18.12.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2009
ClassificationIPC:H04L29/06
[2009/27]
CPC:
G06Q10/107 (EP,US); H04L65/612 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2009/10]H04Q1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/10]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, SYSTEM, NETZGERÄT UND MOBILE DATENDIENSTVERWALTUNGSPLATTFORM ZUM SENDEN VON INHALT[2009/10]
English:METHOD, SYSTEM, NETWORK DEVICE, AND MOBILE DATA SERVICE MANAGEMENT PLATFORM FOR DOWN SENDING CONTENT[2009/10]
French:PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME, DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU ET PLATE-FORME DE GESTION DE SERVICE DE DONNÉES MOBILE POUR ENVOYER UN CONTENU[2009/10]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2008Translation filed 
18.12.2008National basic fee paid 
18.12.2008Search fee paid 
18.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/10]
09.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2012Application withdrawn by applicant  [2012/45]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.07.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XP]WO2007076613  (WIRELESS EDGE CANADA INC [CA], et al) [XP] 1-16* page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 14 *;
 [X]  - JAEGER T ET AL, "Preserving integrity in remote file location and retrieval", NETWORK AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEM SECURITY, 1996., PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYM POSIUM ON SAN DIEGO, CA, USA 22-23 FEB. 1996, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19960222), ISBN 978-0-8186-7222-4, pages 53 - 63, XP010158985 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 55, paragraph 2.2 * * page 56, column 1, line 38 - page 56, line 46 * * pages 57-58, paragraph 4.1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NDSS.1996.492413
International search[A]CN1568051  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN1738467  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN1863334  (CHINA MOBILE COMM GROUP CORP [CN]);
 [XP]CN101072380  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.