Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2136652

EP2136652 - REDUCING THE SENSORY COOLING EFFECT OF POLYOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cargill, Incorporated
15407 West McGinty Road West
Wayzata, MN 55391-1063 / US
[2010/01]
Inventor(s)01 / VERCAUTEREN, Ronny, Leontina, Marcel
Bergstraat 29
B-9120 Beveren / BE
 [2010/01]
Representative(s)Jantschy, Jasmin , et al
Cargill R&D Centre Europe BVBA
Bedrijvenlaan 9
2800 Mechelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2010/01]Elseviers, Myriam , et al
Cargill Europe bvba Legal-IP Department Bedrijvenlaan 9
2800 Mechelen / BE
Application number, filing date08748937.316.04.2008
[2010/01]
WO2008EP03031
Priority number, dateEP2007000770916.04.2007         Original published format: EP 07007709
[2010/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008125344
Date:23.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2136652
Date:30.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008
[2009/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2136652
Date:27.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/22, A23L1/236, A23L1/308, A23G3/42, A23G1/40
[2012/41]
Former International [2010/01]A23L1/236, A23L1/308, A23G3/42, A23G1/40
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/01]
TitleGerman:MINDERUNG DES SENSORISCHEN KÜHLUNGSEFFEKTS VON POLYOLEN[2010/01]
English:REDUCING THE SENSORY COOLING EFFECT OF POLYOLS[2010/01]
French:REDUCTION D'EFFET DE SENSATION RAFRAICHISSANTE DE POLYOLS[2012/44]
Former [2010/01]RÉDUCTION D'EFFET DE SENSATION RAFRAÎCHISSANTE DE POLYOLS
Entry into regional phase23.09.2009National basic fee paid 
23.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/53]
17.12.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2013Fee for grant paid
16.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.02.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.11.2013   
Vos, Derk
Maiwald Patentanwalts -und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/01]
Opponent(s)01  27.11.2013   
Vos, Derk
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, et al
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
21.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.03.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1384/16
20.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
24.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.04.2008
CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
MT27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
TR27.02.2013
IE16.04.2013
LU16.04.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
MT27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
TR27.02.2013
IE16.04.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2015/13]CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
MT27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
IE16.04.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2014/20]CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
IE16.04.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2014/01]CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
MC27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/52]CY27.02.2013
CZ27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/49]CZ27.02.2013
EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
RO27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
SK27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/48]EE27.02.2013
FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
NL27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/41]FI27.02.2013
HR27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/40]FI27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
PT27.06.2013
Former [2013/38]FI27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
LV27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
Former [2013/37]FI27.02.2013
LT27.02.2013
SI27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
GR28.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT27.02.2013
BG27.05.2013
IS27.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT27.02.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004086615  (JOHNSON SCOTT D [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * claim - * * example - * * paragraphs [0006] , [0020] , [0021] , [0025] , [0043] , [0044] *;
 [X]EP0727146  (CERESTAR HOLDING BV [NL]) [X] 7-13 * claim - * * example - *;
 [X]US5629040  (TAKEMORI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 7-13 * examples 5,6 *;
 [X]EP0489515  (CERESTAR HOLDING BV [NL]) [X] 7-13 * claim - * * example - * * page 3, lines 12-35 *;
 [X]US2004151816  (NANA RAVI [US], et al) [X] 7-13 * paragraphs [0004] - [0011] *;
 [AD]US6875460  (CUNNINGHAM MARY LOU [US], et al) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2004086615
 EP0727146
 US5629040
 EP0489515
 US2004151816